Marion County South Carolina v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45146 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2018 |
Case in other court: | South Carolina, 4:18-cv-00115 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:11 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, PLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Marion County South Carolina
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:23 PM EDT |
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, McKesson Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7555076.), filed by Marion County South Carolina. Service due by 4/12/2018(prou, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Myrick, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Lantz, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - DEA Letter 9/27/06, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - DEA Letter 12/27/07, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - HDMA Amicus Brief, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Industry Compliance Guidelines, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Rannazzisi, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - BCBS Report, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Administrative Memoradum of Agreement, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Settlement Agreement and Release | ||
3 | 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Marion County South Carolina.(prou, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/5/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, McKesson Corporation. (prou, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/5/2018.] | |
7 | 7 ***DOCUMENTS E-MAILED:1 Complaint and a certified copy of the docket sheet, to Multidistrict Litigation Panel In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2017-md-2804. (prou, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/5/2018.] | |
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number CTO-6. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (prou, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/5/2018.] | |
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of South Carolina. Case number 4:18-cv-00115. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |