Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Judith E Levy
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 5:18-cv-10431
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2018
Terminated:Jan 29, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Aug 05, 2018 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Hardman Construction Company
Represented By
Courtney L. Nichols
Plunkett Cooney, P.C.
contact info
Thomas P. Vincent
Plunkett & Cooney
contact info
Plaintiff
Harold L Wilson
Represented By
George B. Washington
Scheff & Washington
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
16 16 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Tue 01/29 9:13 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 12/12 2:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Settlement Conference held on 12/12/2018 Disposition: Settlement reached. Stipulated order due within 30 days. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (EBut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
15 15 notice Appear* Wed 12/05 5:04 PM
RENOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 12/12/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
14 14 notice Appear* Tue 12/04 4:19 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 12/13/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 10/25 11:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Settlement Conference held on 10/24/2018 Disposition: No settlement reached (EBut)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
13 13 notice Appear* Mon 09/10 3:53 PM
RENOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 10/24/2018 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Appear* Mon 09/10 10:51 AM
RENOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 9/14/2018 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
11 11 notice Appear* Wed 05/02 2:05 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 9/12/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
10 10 order Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge* Tue 05/01 2:03 PM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Grand: Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/01 1:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/3/2018, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/4/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy and Jury Trial set for 6/3/2019 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. Related [+] (SBur)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 05/01 1:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Scheduling Conference held on 5/1/2018. (SBur)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/30 10:39 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 5/1/2018 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
8 8 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Wed 04/25 8:23 AM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Nichols, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
7 7 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 03/19 9:53 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Hardman Construction Company (Nichols, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 16, 2018
6 6 notice Appear* Fri 03/16 9:51 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Fri 03/16 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Vincent on behalf of Hardman Construction Company. (Vincent, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance Fri 03/16 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney L. Nichols on behalf of Hardman Construction Company. (Nichols, Courtney)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/16 9:41 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Hardman Construction Company. (Nichols, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
2 2 service Summons Issued* Tue 02/06 11:31 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Hardman Construction Company* (DPer)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 02/06 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Harold L Wilson against Harold L Wilson with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6588181 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Mason. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Washington, George)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Tue 02/06 11:31 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DPer)
Related: [-]