New Jersey District Court
Judge:John Michael Vazquez
Referred: Mark Falk
Case #: 2:18-cv-01600
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2018
Terminated:May 02, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Aug 05, 2018 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant
U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC.
U.S.SECURITY ASSOCIATES 333 MEADOWLANDS PARKWAY SUITE D
SECAUCUS, NJ 07094
Represented By
PRIYA S. AMIN
Ford Harrson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FINLEY FENTON
110 CHESTNUT RIDGE RD. #104
MONTVALE, NJ 07645


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
9 9 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/02 4:44 PM
ORDER that the Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED and the above matter will be consolidated with Finley Fenton v. U.S. Security Associates. Inc., No.: 2:18-cv-01600-JMV-Mf for all purposes, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 05/02/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association Wed 05/02 4:45 PM
Cases associated: Create association to 2:17-cv-13589-JMV-MF. (ek)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/02 4:46 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
8 8 misc Letter Thu 03/22 1:09 PM
Letter from Salvador P. Simao, Esq. Advising of Motion to Consolidate with 2:17-cv-13589. (SIMAO, SALVADOR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/19 2:37 PM
LETTER ORDER pursuant to Rule 16.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/19/18. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/27 5:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Plaintiff's Jury Demand by U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC..(AMIN, PRIYA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
5 5 respoth Response (NOT Motion) Fri 02/16 2:49 PM
RESPONSE re1 Notice of Removal, submitted by Finley Fenton. (sr, )
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/13 1:50 PM
NOTICE/CONSENT & REGISTRATION FORM to receive documents electronically by FINLEY FENTON (sr, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 02/13 12:46 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint..(AMIN, PRIYA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 02/13 1:17 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/27/18. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/07 12:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC. identifying U.S. Security Associates Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (AMIN, PRIYA)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Wed 02/07 11:26 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action modified from 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act to 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmt Relations . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/06 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC. from Passaic, case number SC-1235-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8457368), filed by U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC..(AMIN, PRIYA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/07 9:04 AM
Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
Related: [-]