New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alison J Nathan
Case #: 1:18-cv-00706
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2018
Terminated:Jan 07, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 25, 2018 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
XIAOFENG001
Defendant
WUMANNA
Defendant
WORLDMAKEUP
Defendant
WOO CHANT
Defendant
WINDLYFLY
Defendant
WH
Defendant
WENSHUIXIANG
Defendant
WARM COCOA COFFEE
Defendant
WANTINGTING233
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
XIAOXIANGZI418
Defendant
VALUEQUALITYANDSERVICE
Defendant
TVG
Defendant
TSUNEYO MACHINERY ACCESSORIES
Defendant
TOPBUAUTY
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
TOBEST2016
Defendant
TIAN MA KE JI
Defendant
YOYO003
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ZSJ
Defendant
ZHI JIA DAILY NECESSITIES
Defendant
ZHANGYILIN66
Defendant
ZHANGYAZI
Defendant
ZHANGSHAOPING85
Defendant
ZHANGMINGHAO
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ZDSS
Defendant
YUGUIHAI
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
THEBAY
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
YJNFNHY
Defendant
YJ STYLISH STORE
Defendant
YIWUTENGYUE
Defendant
YIQIUMEI
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
YIKUKUNANZHUANG
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
YANGRONGXXMM@163.COM
Defendant
XINGYUEXIAOBAODIAN
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
NEW FASHION PRODUCT TOY
Defendant
QINGYANGXINXIU
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
QINGCHUNANGRAN
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
PPBAO
Defendant
PENCILCASE
Defendant
PARDARG
Defendant
PACENTO OFFICAL SHOES STORE
Defendant
OCEANSTARS
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
NEWPAGE0
Defendant
SUPERLLV
Defendant
NECESSARYCLOTHING
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
MOST TIME
Defendant
MOONLIGHTLOVER
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
MISS MOON
Defendant
MILANOOPANDA
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
MEN'S FASHION SHOES STORE
Defendant
MEMO
Defendant
MEIRLY
Defendant
SC888999
Defendant
SUMMERDEAL
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
SUMMERDANCE
Defendant
SONG789
Defendant
SMARTWEICONG
Defendant
SHOPSTYLE
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
SHENZHENXINSHIDAIDIANZISHANGWUDIAN
Defendant
SHENZHEN YURIY TRADING CO., LTD.
Defendant
SEXY WOMEN DRESS
Defendant
RUN-RABBIT
Defendant
ROSEWHOLESALEBUYING
Represented By
Ivan Miles Posey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo And Lampl LLP
contact info
Alan Murray Kindred
Blecher, Collins, Pepperman & Joyce, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
RFHNGMTRTNJJTED
Plaintiff
WOWWEE USA, INC.
Represented By
Brieanne Scully
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Jason M. Drangel
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Spencer Joseph Wolgang
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Mary Catherine Brennan
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Ashly Erin Sands
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WOWWEE CANADA, INC.
Represented By
Brieanne Scully
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Jason M. Drangel
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Spencer Joseph Wolgang
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Mary Catherine Brennan
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Ashly Erin Sands
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WOWWEE GROUP LIMITED
Represented By
Brieanne Scully
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Jason M. Drangel
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Spencer Joseph Wolgang
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Mary Catherine Brennan
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Ashly Erin Sands
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
WANELOLIFE
Terminated: 04/25/2018
Defendant
WORLD TRADING COMPANY
Terminated: 06/20/2018
Defendant
TOMORROWSUNSHINEE
Terminated: 06/01/2018
Defendant
TIANHONGYIHUA
Terminated: 06/01/2018
Defendant
THE MOST ROMANTIC THING
Terminated: 04/25/2018
Defendant
ZHANGWEM3
Terminated: 06/01/2018
Defendant
YUTAO, Z_LIVING
Terminated: 06/01/2018
Defendant
YAYABB STORE
Terminated: 04/25/2018
Defendant
YANGTTE
Terminated: 04/25/2018
Defendant
QINSHI
Terminated: 06/01/2018
Defendant
OVERSEE
Terminated: 06/01/2018
Defendant
NICE DEAL SHOP
Terminated: 04/25/2018
Defendant
MENGNAN MAKER
Terminated: 04/25/2018
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 02/05/2018
Defendant
SDFGH
Terminated: 04/25/2018
Defendant
ROMANTICSHOPPING
Terminated: 04/25/2018
Defendant
RELL MAIL
Terminated: 06/25/2018
Defendant
QUENTIN TIN
Terminated: 04/25/2018
Defendant
THE GIRL TO HEAVEN
Terminated: 06/01/2018
Defendant
SUNSHINE ONON
Terminated: 06/01/2018
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 02/05/2018


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
95 95 misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Terminated - Submitted Tue 01/07 5:20 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 1/7/2020 in a court action filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (kv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
94 94 6 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 01/07 5:11 PM
OPINION AND ORDER re:90 MOTION for Reconsideration re;83 Memorandum & Opinion,,, . filed by WOWWEE USA, INC., WOWWEE GROUP LIMITED, WOWWEE CANADA, INC.. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of the Court's March 27, 2019 Opinion and Order is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. This order resolves Dkt. No. 90. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/7/2020) (kv)
Related: [-]