Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-cv-00294
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2018
Re-opened:Mar 25, 2022
Terminated:Nov 29, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 05, 2018 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Ashtabula County, Ohio
Represented By
Timothy T. Reid
Mansour Gavin
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Matthew Johns
Represented By
Timothy T. Reid
Mansour Gavin
contact info
Susan M. Bungard
Ohio Patrolmen'S Benevolent Association
contact info
Plaintiff
A. P.
Represented By
Richard J. Perez
Rosplock & Perez
contact info
Michael J. Lerner
Denman & Lerner
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Palma
Represented By
Richard J. Perez
Rosplock & Perez
contact info
Michael J. Lerner
Denman & Lerner
contact info
Plaintiff
Salvatore Palma, Jr.
Represented By
Richard J. Perez
Rosplock & Perez
contact info
Michael J. Lerner
Denman & Lerner
contact info

GPO Mar 02 2021
Opinion and Order For the reasons stated in the Order, and because there are no genuine disputes of material fact on any of Plaintiffs' claims, the Court grants summary judgment, ECF Doc. 46, in favor of Defendants. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/2/2021. (K,K)
GPO Sep 06 2022
Opinion & Order For the reasons stated in the Order, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Count IX of the Amended Complaint (ECF Doc. 60) is denied in part and granted in part. Plaintiffs may proceed on their theory of Monell liability that the County failed to adequately train the deputies on encounters with mentally ill individuals. However, Defendants have demonstrated that no genuine dispute of material facts exists with respect to the Plaintiffs' failure-to-investigate theory or their failure-to-train theory with respect to the use of force, baton use, and de-escalation techniques, and summary judgment is, therefore, appropriate on those aspects of Count IX. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/6/2022.(K,K)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
142 142 order Minute Order _ Final Settlement Conference Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/29 7:38 PM
Order of Dismissal. On November 29, 2023, the Court engaged the parties in mediation and they reached a resolution. The case is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs. The Court retains jurisdiction to ensure the settlement agreement is executed. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/29/2023. (K,K)
Related: [-]
141 141 minutes Jury Trial - Held Wed 11/29 5:07 PM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Jury Trial continued on 11/29/2023. Plaintiff's case continued. Jury Trial to resume on 11/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (Court Reporter: Susan Trischan.) Time: 7 hours. (K,K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
140 140 minutes Jury Trial - Held Tue 11/28 5:14 PM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Jury Trial held on 11/28/2023. Plaintiff's case continued. Jury Trial to resume on 11/29/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (Court Reporter: Susan Trischan.) Time: 5 hours. (K,K)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
139 139 transc Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter Mon 11/27 7:54 PM
Transcript of Excerpt of Daubert Hearing Portion of Final Pretrial Proceedings held on November 20, 2023 before Judge Dan A. Polster. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Sue Trischan at 216-357-7087. [57 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 12/4/2023. Redaction Request due 12/18/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2024. (T,S)
Related: [-]
138 138 minutes Jury Trial - Begun Mon 11/27 5:35 PM
Minutes of proceedings before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Jury Trial held on 11/27/2023. Jury selected. Opening arguments presented. Plaintiff's witness testimony heard and continued. Jury Trial to resume on 11/28/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (Court Reporter: Susan Trischan.) Time: 7 hours 30 minutes. (K,K)
Related: [-]