North Dakota District Court
Judge:Daniel L Hovland
Referred: Clare R Hochhalter
Case #: 1:18-cv-00024
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2018
Terminated:May 04, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Aug 04, 2018 4:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Bruce Herr
Represented By
Kirsten H. Tuntland
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Meredith L. Vukelic
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Rachel A. Bruner
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Kaseman-Wolf
Represented By
Kirsten H. Tuntland
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Meredith L. Vukelic
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Rachel A. Bruner
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Defendant
Dynette Ketterling
Represented By
Kirsten H. Tuntland
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Meredith L. Vukelic
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Rachel A. Bruner
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Defendant
Shawn Kuntz
Represented By
Kirsten H. Tuntland
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Meredith L. Vukelic
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Rachel A. Bruner
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Defendant
Curt Meidinger
Represented By
Kirsten H. Tuntland
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Meredith L. Vukelic
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Rachel A. Bruner
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Defendant
Trina Schilling
Represented By
Kirsten H. Tuntland
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Meredith L. Vukelic
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Rachel A. Bruner
Pearce & Durick
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathryn Lynn Pinke
Represented By
Micheal A. Mulloy
Stebbins Mulloy, LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 01 2018
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2018 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
GPO Apr 04 2018
ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
GPO May 14 2018
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Wishek, North Dakota before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
GPO Dec 20 2018
2018, respectively) (BG) ORDER adopting in part 31 Stipulation re Amended Scheduling Discovery/Plan. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 5/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/3/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/7/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2019. Threshold Motions due by 3/1/2020. Bench Trial set for 1/22/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (FPT and bench trial previously set for 8/20/2019 and 9/04/
GPO Feb 26 2019
ORDER adopting 37 Stipulation. Threshold Motions due by 8/2/2019. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
GPO Nov 18 2019
ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
GPO May 04 2020
ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. (CM)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 04, 2020
69 69 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 05/04 4:45 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Bruce Herr, Curt Meidinger, Dynette Ketterling, Melissa Kaseman-Wolf, Shawn Kuntz, Trina Schilling against Kathryn Lynn Pinke.(am)
Related: [-]
68 68 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/04 3:32 PM
(Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland finding as moot40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See Doc. No. 67. (CM)
Related: [-]
67 67 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 05/04 3:18 PM
ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting46 Motion for Summary Judgment. (CM)
Related: [-]