Original Case: 2:11-cv-05912

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv-56970
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2013
Terminated:Mar 14, 2018
Last checked: Friday Mar 16, 2018 1:37 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellant
MOTHERLESS, INC., a New York corporation
Represented By
David Speer Richman
Theodora Oringher PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
JOSHUA LANGE, an individual
Represented By
David Speer Richman
Theodora Oringher PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
VENTURA CONTENT, LTD., an Anguilla corporation
Represented By
John Tehranian
One LLP
contact info
Peter Afrasiabi
One LLP
contact info
Christopher Arledge
One LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 14 2018
FILED OPINION (ANDREW J. KLEINFELD, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN) AFFIRMED. Judge: AJK Authoring, Judge: JBR Dissenting, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10797616] [13-56332, 13-56970]

Docket last updated: 03/16/2018 1:35 AM PDT
Wednesday, November 20, 2013
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellants Joshua Lange and Motherless, Inc. on 11/20/2013. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/27/2013. Transcript ordered by 12/20/2013. Transcript due 03/20/2014. Appellants Joshua Lange and Motherless, Inc. opening brief due 04/29/2014. Appellee Ventura Content, Ltd. answering brief due 05/29/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8871043] (JN) [Entered: 11/20/2013 03:07 PM]
Related: [-]