Hancock County v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45153 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Eastern, 2:18-cv-00010 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:11 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Harco, Inc. fka Harco Drug, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Hancock County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:31 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 2/6/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3580528.), filed by Hancock County.(Fuller, Michael) [Transferred from tned on 2/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Other Civil Coversheet, | ||
Att: 2 Other CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 2/6/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/19/18. (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 2/6/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/19/18. (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 2/6/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/19/18. (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 2/6/2018.] | |
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (AMP) [Transferred from tned on 2/6/2018.] | ||
5 | 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) transferring MDL case to the Northern District of Ohio. (AMP) [Transferred from tned on 2/6/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Eastern. Case number 2:18-cv-00010. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |