Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Peggy A Leen
Case #: 2:18-cv-00218
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2018
Terminated:Jun 21, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Aug 05, 2018 2:32 AM PDT
Defendant
American Casino & Entertainment Properties, LLC
Defendant
Golden Casinos Nevada, LLC
Defendant
Golden Entertainment (NV) , Inc.
Defendant
Stratosphere Gaming, LLC
Plaintiff
Robert Herrera
Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin, LLP 3556 E. Russell Road
Las Vegas, NV 89120
Represented By
Patrick F. Madden
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
Bradley Scott Schrager
Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin
contact info
Stuart H McCluer
Mcculley Mccluer PLLC
contact info
Stuart McCluer
Mcculley Mccluer PLLC
contact info
Don Springmeyer
Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman And Rabkin, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Stratosphere Holding, LLC
Terminated: 05/08/2018


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, June 21, 2018
17 17 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Thu 06/21 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Robert Herrera. (Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 06/22 7:53 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
16 16 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 05/30 8:52 AM
ORDER Granting15 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that THIS ACTION IS STAYED pending a ruling on subject-matter jurisdiction in Cabral et al. v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation et al. , Case No. 2:17-cv-02841-APG-VCF, and all deadlines are suspended. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 25, 2018
15 15 motion Stipulation Fri 05/25 1:22 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Stay Proceedings and Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint re1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Robert Herrera. (Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Agreement
Monday, May 14, 2018
14 14 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Mon 05/14 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re13 Summons Returned Executed, by Plaintiff Robert Herrera. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/14 10:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Herrera re1 Complaint,,. American Casino & Entertainment Properties, LLC served on 5/4/2018, answer due 5/25/2018; Golden Casinos Nevada, LLC served on 5/4/2018, answer due 5/25/2018; Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc. served on 5/4/2018, answer due 5/25/2018; Stratosphere Gaming, LLC served on 5/7/2018, answer due 5/28/2018.(Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image 14 added on 5/14/2018. (EDS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
utility Add and Terminate Parties Tue 05/08 3:20 PM
Party Stratosphere Holding, LLC terminated per12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (EDS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
12 12 notice Notice Other Mon 05/07 4:18 PM
NOTICE Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Stratosphere Holding, LLC, Only, Without Prejudice by Robert Herrera. (Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
11 11 service Summons Issued Thu 05/03 1:12 PM
Summons Issued as to American Casino & Entertainment Properties, LLC re1 Complaint. (ADR)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Proposed Summons to be issued Thu 05/03 11:42 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Robert Herrera. (Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 05/03 10:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Golden Casinos Nevada, LLC, Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc., Stratosphere Gaming, LLC, Stratosphere Holding, LLC re1 Complaint. (ADR)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Proposed Summons to be issued Thu 05/03 9:58 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Robert Herrera.(Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Monday, March 05, 2018
7 7 7 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/05 4:29 PM
ORDER Granting6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stuart McCluer and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/5/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
6 6 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 03/02 10:18 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stuart H. McCluer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4990498) by Plaintiff Robert Herrera. (Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
5 5 6 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/23 4:18 PM
ORDER Granting4 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/23/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
4 4 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Thu 02/22 1:19 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Patrick F. Madden and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4979550) by Plaintiff Robert Herrera. (Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
3 3 notice Notice Related Cases Tue 02/06 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:17-cv-02841-APG-VCF,2:17-cv-02848-APG-CWH, 2:17-cv-02859-APG-NJK, 2:17-cv-02868-APG-GWF, 2:17-cv-02950-JAD-NJK, 2:17-cv-02924-GMN-PAL,2:17-cv-02913-GMN-VCF,2:17-cv-02930-APG-CWH, 2:17-cv-02961-JAD-GWF, 2:18-cv-00095-JAD-CWH by Plaintiff Robert Herrera. (Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 02/06 3:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robert Herrera. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/06 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT against American Casino & Entertainment Properties, LLC, Golden Casinos Nevada, LLC, Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc., Stratosphere Gaming, LLC, Stratosphere Holding, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4959386) by Robert Herrera. Proof of service due by 5/7/2018.(Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 02/06 3:59 PM
Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (ADR)
Related: [-]