South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Case #: 8:18-cv-00334
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2018
Terminated:May 31, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Aug 05, 2018 5:19 AM EDT
Defendant
BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois
Represented By
Brian Ford Hendricks
Reed Smith Llp (chi)
contact info
James Derrick Quattlebaum
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd
contact info
Martin James Bishop
Reed Smith Llp (chi)
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Burrows
Represented By
Ryan Patrick Alderson
Foster Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 31, 2018
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order Thu 05/31 1:53 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/31/2018. (abuc)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 05/31 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Robert Burrows (Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Case Reassigned CV Thu 05/31 9:32 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
16 16 misc Case Reassigned CV Wed 05/30 8:04 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr. Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 05/18 10:02 AM
ORDER granting 14 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Erisa Case Management Order extending deadline 30 days filed by BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois. Joint Stipulation Deadline 9/6/2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/18/2018. (abuc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
14 14 motion Amend/Correct Thu 05/17 1:57 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct12 Erisa Case Management Order extending deadline 30 days by BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois. Response to Motion due by 5/31/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Quattlebaum, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
13 13 misc Case Reassigned CV Tue 04/10 11:30 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
12 12 order Erisa Order Fri 04/06 11:13 AM
ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Joint Stipulation Deadline 8/6/2018. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/6/18. (alew, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
11 11 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 04/05 4:04 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois.(Quattlebaum, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/05 4:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois.(Quattlebaum, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/28 3:14 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/28/2018.(abuc)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Wed 03/28 1:15 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Ford Hendricks ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7690209) by BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois. Response to Motion due by 4/11/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Quattlebaum, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Wed 03/28 1:13 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Martin James Bishop ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7690196) by BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois. Response to Motion due by 4/11/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Quattlebaum, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission
Monday, March 19, 2018
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Mon 03/19 10:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Burrows. BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois served on 2/22/2018, answer due 4/5/2018.(Alderson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Greencard
Thursday, March 08, 2018
5 5 misc Letter Extending Time to Answer Thu 03/08 1:16 PM
LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois answer due 4/5/2018. (Quattlebaum, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 02/07 10:17 AM
Summons Issued as to BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois. (abuc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 02/07 10:16 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Burrows.(abuc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/07 10:16 AM
COMPLAINT against BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7597424.), filed by Robert Burrows. Service due by 5/7/2018(abuc)
Related: [-]