Arizona District Court
Judge:John J Tuchi
Case #: 3:18-cv-08019
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2018
Terminated:Dec 04, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Aug 05, 2018 1:26 AM MST
Claimant
Brandi Hart
Represented By
Mary Lee Caruso
Alder Law PC
contact info
Claimant
Nathan Preuit
Represented By
Mary Lee Caruso
Alder Law PC
contact info
Claimant
Wayne Ramos
Represented By
Allen D Bucknell
Goldberg & Osborne
contact info
Claimant
Karen Rea
Represented By
Michael Warzynski
Jardine Baker Hickman & Houston PLLC
contact info
Bradley R Jardine
Jardine Baker Hickman & Houston PLLC
contact info
Movant
Jason Cloninger
Represented By
Neda Lili Lotfi
Cotchett Pitre & Mccarthy Llp - Santa Monica, Ca
contact info
Joel Matthew Gordon
Cotchett Pitre & Mccarthy Llp - Santa Monica, Ca
contact info
Robert Bruce Hutchinson
Cotchett Pitre & Mccarthy Llp - Santa Monica, Ca
contact info
Movant
Lisa Cloninger
Represented By
Neda Lili Lotfi
Cotchett Pitre & Mccarthy Llp - Santa Monica, Ca
contact info
Joel Matthew Gordon
Cotchett Pitre & Mccarthy Llp - Santa Monica, Ca
contact info
Robert Bruce Hutchinson
Cotchett Pitre & Mccarthy Llp - Santa Monica, Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Julio Salas
Represented By
Terence S Cox
Cox Wootton Lerner Griffin & Hansen LLP
contact info
Thomas M Fedeli
Cox Wootton Lerner Griffin & Hansen Llp - Los Angeles, Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Monica Salas
Represented By
Terence S Cox
Cox Wootton Lerner Griffin & Hansen LLP
contact info
Thomas M Fedeli
Cox Wootton Lerner Griffin & Hansen Llp - Los Angeles, Ca
contact info

GPO Feb 12 2019
ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. Claimants Hart and Preuit shall file an Answer to the Complaint within the time limit set forth in Rule 12. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/12/19. (DXD)
GPO Aug 16 2019
ORDER granting in 49 Motion for Default Judgment as to all possible claimants, known or unknown, who have not filed and served their claims or answers for claims arising out of the August 6, 2017 Incident Involving the Vessel. Plaintiffs-in-Limitation Julio Salas and Monica Salas will be entitled to judgment as against all claimants, known and unknown, who have not filed their claim or otherwise appeared in this action, except to the extent that such claimant(s) can demonstrate good cause for the Court to set aside the default judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c) and 60(b). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/16/19. (DXD)
GPO Aug 19 2019
**AMENDED by Order 52** ORDER denying 47 Application for Entry of Default. Setting Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The Rea Claimants shall have retained counsel who shall have filed a Notice of Appearance and represent them at the status hearing or shall Show Cause why the Court should not enter judgment of limitation. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/16/19. (DXD) Modified on 8/19/2019 (DXD).
GPO Aug 19 2019
AMENDED ORDER denying 47 Application for Entry of Default. Setting Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/10/19 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The Rea Claimants shall have retained counsel who shall have filed a Notice of Appearance and represent them at the status hearing or shall Show Cause why the Court should not enter judgment of limitation. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/19/19. (DXD)
GPO Sep 09 2019
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED vacating the telephonic Status Hearing in this matter set for 10:00 a.m. on September 10, 2019, and resetting it for September 19, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 505, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J. Tuchi. Chambers will e-mail dial-in instructions to counsel prior to the hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that since Claimant Karen Rea has not provided the Court with an e-mail address, Petitioners' counsel shall provide a copy of this Order to Claimant Rea. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/9/19. (JAMA) Modified on 9/9/2019 to add WO (JAMA).

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, December 04, 2020
64 64 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/04 8:19 AM
ORDER granting the Stipulation (Doc.63 ). This matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to close this matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/3/20. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
63 63 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 12/02 4:32 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Julio Salas, Monica Salas. (Fedeli, Thomas)
Related: [-]
62 62 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/02 4:26 AM
NOTICE re: of Resolution of State Court Claims by Julio Salas, Monica Salas re:61 Order Staying Case . (Fedeli, Thomas)
Related: [-]