New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Allan L Gropper
Case #: 1:09-bk-11977
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2009
Creditor Meeting:Sep 17, 2009
Terminated:Jun 30, 2013
Plan Confirmed:Dec 23, 2009

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. AssetsMore than $1 billion
Est. Liabilities More than $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
General Growth Properties, Inc.
110 N Wacker Dr
Chicago, IL 60606-1511
Represented By
Samuel Louis Blatnick
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
contact info
Adam P. Strochak
Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP
contact info
Douglas E. Spelfogel
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Gary Holtzer
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Melanie Gray
Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP
contact info
Sylvia Ann Mayer
Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP
contact info
James H.M. Sprayregen
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Marcia L. Goldstein
Weil Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Stephen A. Youngman
Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent
Attn: James Le 2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of General Growth Properties, Inc., et al.
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP One Bryant Park
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Michael Scott Stamer
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Alan D. Halperin
Halperin Battaglia Raicht LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Andrea B. Schwartz
Dep'T Of Justice - Office Of U.S.Trustee
contact info
Elisabetta Gasparini
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Greg M. Zipes
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Aug 11 2009
(Written Opinion) Memorandum of Opinion Signed on 8/11/2009 Regarding Motion to Dismiss (related document(s)334, 631, 429, 630, 629) (Porter, Marguerite)
GPO Jun 16 2011
(Written) Memorandum of Opinion Signed on 6/16/2011 Regarding Default Interest (Homart). (Porter, Marguerite)
GPO Jul 20 2011
(Written Opinion) Memorandum of Opinion Regarding Eurohypo AG, New York Branch Signed on 7/20/2011. (related document(s)6232, 6709) (Porter, Marguerite)

Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Monday, July 22, 2013
7090 7090 Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 06/26/2013 10:11AM RE: Motion by Debtors for entry of final decree closing the remaining reorganized Debtors chapter 11 cases. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/21/2013. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/29/2013. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/22/2013. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/21/2013. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]