Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Referred: Marshal D Morgan
Case #: 3:18-cv-01076
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2018
Re-opened:Aug 11, 2022
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 08, 2018 4:50 AM AST
Defendant
Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Aura A. Montes-Rodriguez
O'Neill & Borges, LLC
contact info
Mark L. Durbin
On N. Wacker Dr
contact info
Alfredo F. Ramirez-Macdonald
O'Neill & Borges
contact info
Scott T. Peloza
One N. Wacher Dr.
contact info
Defendant
Healthcare Data Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Melissa C. Rodriguez
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp Ny
contact info
Charles J. Malaret
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Cancio, Nadal, Rivera & Diaz, P.S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Allscripts Healthcare, LLC
Represented By
Aura A. Montes-Rodriguez
O'Neill & Borges, LLC
contact info
Mark L. Durbin
On N. Wacker Dr
contact info
Alfredo F. Ramirez-Macdonald
O'Neill & Borges
contact info
Scott T. Peloza
One N. Wacher Dr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan M. Rodriguez-Rivera
Represented By
Francisco L. Charles-Gomez
contact info
Jorge L. Guerrero-Calderon
Cond. Gallardo
contact info

GPO Jun 27 2023
ORDER granting 222 Motion to Strike 216 Jury Demand. See attached Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 06/27/2023. (VTH)
GPO Jan 10 2025
OPINION AND ORDER The Court hereby finds that the Parties are compelled to proceed to arbitration. Accordingly, Plaintiff's case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/10/2025. (LTE)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
342 342 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 05/15 12:11 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1463 for340 Notice of Appeal, filed by Juan M. Rodriguez-Rivera. (idg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
341 341 appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA Mon 05/12 2:10 PM
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re340 Notice of Appeal [Docket Entries 325, 326, 339 & 340] (idg)
Related: [-]
340 340 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 05/12 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to326 Judgment, 339 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,325 Opinion and Order, by Juan M. Rodriguez-Rivera. Filing fee $605, receipt number APRDC-9094769. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (Charles-Gomez, Francisco)
Related: [-]