New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00015
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2018
Terminated:Apr 06, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2018 2:13 AM EST
Defendant
Albert Armetta (5)
Represented By
Vincent John Martinelli
The Law Offices Of Vincent J. Martinelli
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Cammarano, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Elizabeth Edwards Macedonio
Elizabeth E. Macedonio, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Eugene Castelle (10)
Represented By
Gerald Joseph McMahon
Gerald J. Mcmahon
contact info
Defendant
Simone Esposito (8)
Represented By
Jonathan Andrew Marvinny
Federal Defenders Of New York Inc. (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Domenick Miniero (6)
Represented By
Bradley Lamar Henry
The Henry Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Ernest Montevecchi (9)
Represented By
Thomas Alton Harvey
Harvey&hackett
contact info
Leonardo M Aldridge
Law Offices Of Leonardo M. Aldridge
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Sabella (3)
Represented By
Joseph R. Corozzo
Rubinstein & Corozzo, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Santapaolo (7)
Represented By
Jill R. Shellow
Law Offices Of Jill R. Shellow
contact info
Defendant
George Tropiano (4)
Represented By
David Keith Bertan
Law Office Of David K. Bertan, Esq
contact info
Defendant
John Zancocchio (2)
Represented By
John C. Meringolo
Meringolo & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jason Michael Swergold
U.S. Attorney'S Office- Southern District Of New York
contact info
Jessica Greenwood
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2022 2:45 PM EDT
Friday, January 12, 2018
INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Joseph Cammarano, Jr, John Zancocchio, Joseph Sabella, George Tropiano, Albert Armetta, Domenick Miniero, Joseph Santapaolo, Simone Esposito, Ernest Montevecchi, Eugene Castelle. (jm)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF as to Joseph Cammarano, Jr, John Zancocchio, Joseph Sabella, George Tropiano, Albert Armetta, Domenick Miniero, Joseph Santapaolo, Simone Esposito, Ernest Montevecchi, Eugene Castelle. (jm)
Related: [-]
Case as to Joseph Cammarano, Jr, John Zancocchio, Joseph Sabella, George Tropiano, Albert Armetta, Domenick Miniero, Joseph Santapaolo, Simone Esposito, Ernest Montevecchi, Eugene Castelle ASSIGNED to Judge Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jm)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Joseph Cammarano, Jr, John Zancocchio, Joseph Sabella, George Tropiano, Albert Armetta, Domenick Miniero, Joseph Santapaolo, Simone Esposito, Ernest Montevecchi, Eugene Castelle. Attorney Jason Michael Swergold,Jessica Greenwood for USA added. (jm)
Related: [-]
Arrest of John Zancocchio (2). [*** NOTE: Refer to Disposition Sheet for Rule 9 Proceeding held on 1/12/2018. ***] (bw)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Arraignment as to John Zancocchio (2) Count 1,3 held on 1/12/2018. Plea entered by John Zancocchio (2) Count 1,3 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER as to John Zancocchio (2). Time excluded from 1/12/2018 until 1/18/2018. (By Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/2018) (bw)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Ernest Montevecchi (9). [*** NOTE: Refer to Disposition Sheet for Rule 9 Proceeding held on 1/12/2018. ***] (bw)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Arraignment as to Ernest Montevecchi (9) Count 1 held on 1/12/2018. Plea entered by Ernest Montevecchi (9) Count 1 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER as to Ernest Montevecchi (9). Time excluded from 1/12/2018 until 1/18/2018. (By Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/2018) (bw)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Joseph Sabella (3). [*** NOTE: Refer to Disposition Sheet for Rule 9 Proceeding held on 1/12/2018. ***] (bw)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Arraignment as to Joseph Sabella (3) Count 1,3 held on 1/12/2018. Plea entered by Joseph Sabella (3) Count 1,3 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER as to Joseph Sabella (3). Time excluded from 1/12/2018 until 1/18/2018. Detention Hearing set for 1/16/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (By Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/2018) (bw)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Albert Armetta (5). [*** NOTE: Refer to Disposition Sheet for Rule 9 Proceeding held on 1/12/2018. ***] (bw)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Arraignment as to Albert Armetta (5) Count 1,2 held on 1/12/2018. Plea entered by Albert Armetta (5) Count 1,2 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER as to Albert Armetta (5). Time excluded from 1/12/2018 until 1/18/2018. (By Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/2018) (bw)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Joseph Cammarano, Jr. (1). [*** NOTE: Refer to Disposition Sheet for Rule 9 Proceeding held on 1/12/2018. ***] (bw)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Arraignment as to Joseph Cammarano Jr. (1) Count 1,3 held on 1/12/2018. Plea entered by Joseph Cammarano Jr. (1) Count 1,3 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER as to Joseph Cammarano, Jr. (1). Time excluded from 1/12/2018 until 1/18/2018. (By Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/2018) (bw)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Simone Esposito (8). [*** NOTE: Refer to Disposition Sheet for Rule 9 Proceeding held on 1/12/2018. ***] (bw)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Arraignment as to Simone Esposito (8) Count 1 held on 1/12/2018. Plea entered by Simone Esposito (8) Count 1 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER as to Simone Esposito (8). Time excluded from 1/12/2018 until 1/18/2018. (By Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/2018) (bw)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Eugene Castelle (10). [*** NOTE: Refer to Disposition Sheet for Rule 9 Proceeding held on 1/12/2018. ***] (bw)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Arraignment as to Eugene Castelle (10) Count 3 held on 1/12/2018. Plea entered by Eugene Castelle (10) Count 3 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER as to Eugene Castelle (10). Time excluded from 1/12/2018 until 1/18/2018. (By Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/2018) (bw)
Related: [-]
Arrest of George Tropiano (4). [*** NOTE: Refer to Disposition Sheet for Rule 9 Proceeding held on 1/12/2018. ***] (bw)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Arraignment as to George Tropiano (4) Count 1,3 held on 1/12/2018. Plea entered by George Tropiano (4) Count 1,3 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER as to George Tropiano (4). Time excluded from 1/12/2018 until 1/18/2018. (By Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/2018) (bw)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Ernest Montevecchi. Attorney Leonardo M Aldridge for Ernest Montevecchi added. (jm)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to John Zancocchio. Attorney John C. Meringolo for John Zancocchio added. (jm)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 3, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 3, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 1, 3, Sealed Defendant 4 (4) count(s) 1, 3, Sealed Defendant 5 (5) count(s) 1, 2, Sealed Defendant 6 (6) count(s) 1, 3, Sealed Defendant 7 (7) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 8 (8) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 9 (9) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 10 (10) count(s) 3. (jm)
Related: [-]
2 2 Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3, Sealed Defendant 4, Sealed Defendant 5, Sealed Defendant 6, Sealed Defendant 7, Sealed Defendant 8, Sealed Defendant 9, Sealed Defendant 10. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/18)(jm)
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to John Zancocchio (2) held on 1/12/2018. Date of Arrest: 1/12/2018. AUSA Jason Swergold. Defense Counsel John Meringolo (CJA). Proceeding: Rule 9. BAIL DISPOSITION: $1 million PRB; 3 FRP; secured by Cash or property valued at $500,000 in the aggregate; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY; surrender travel documents (& no new applications); pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; home incarceration; electronic monitoring; Defendant not to possess firearm/destructive device/other weapon. Defendant to be released on own signature, plus the following conditions: 3 FRP signatures and setup of electronic monitoring by PTS; remaining conditions to be met by 1/26/2018. Defendant to have no contact with co-defendants except in the presence of counsel. Defendant to have no contact with know victims of or witnesses to offenses alleged in Indictment. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 1/18/2018. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 1/18/2018. (bw) (Main Document 13 replaced on 1/16/2018) (bw). Modified on 1/16/2018 (bw).
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to Ernest Montevecchi (9) held on 1/12/2018. Date of Arrest: 1/12/2018. AUSA Jason Swergold. Defense Counsel Leonardo Aldridge (CJA). Proceeding: Rule 9. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $500,000 PRB; 2 FRP; secured by property: Home in NJ; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/DNJ; surrender travel documents (& no new applications); pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; home incarceration; electronic monitoring; Defendant not to possess firearm/destructive device/other weapon. Defendant to be released on own signature; remaining conditions to be met by: FRPs to sign by 1/19/2018. Security to be posted by 1/26/2018. Defendant to be no contact with co-defendants except in presence of counsel. Defendant to have no contact with known victims of or witnesses to offenses charged in Indictment. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 1/18/2018. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 1/18/2018. (bw)
Related: [-]
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to Joseph Sabella (3) held on 1/12/2018. Date of Arrest: 1/12/2018. AUSA Jason Swergold. Defense Counsel Vincent Martinelli (arraignment only) Related [+]. Proceeding: Rule 9. BAIL DISPOSITION: Detention Hearing scheduled for Tuesday, 1/16/2018, 11:00 AM. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 1/18/2018. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 1/18/2018. (bw)
Related: [-] tained
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to Albert Armetta (5) held on 1/12/2018. Date of Arrest: 1/12/2018. AUSA Jason Swergold. Defense Counsel Vincent Martinelli Related [+]. Proceeding: Rule 9. BAIL DISPOSITION: $2 million PRB; 2 FRP; secured by property: Real property valued at $1 million in the aggregate; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY; surrender travel documents (& no new applications); pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; home detention; curfew; electronic monitoring; Defendant not to possess firearm/destructive device/other weapon; Defendant to be detained until all conditions are met. Defendant to have not contact with co-defendants except in the presence of counsel. Defendant to have no contact with known victims of or witnesses to offenses alleged in Indictment. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 1/18/2018. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 1/18/2018. (bw)
Related: [-] tained
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to Joseph Cammarano, Jr. (1) held on 1/12/2018. Date of Arrest: 1/12/2018. AUSA Jason Swergold. Defense Counsel Elizabeth Macedonio Related [+]. Proceeding: Rule 9. BAIL DISPOSITION: Detention on consent without prejudice. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 1/18/2018. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 1/18/2018. (bw)
Related: [-] tained
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to Simone Esposito (8) held on 1/12/2018. Date of Arrest: 1/12/2018. AUSA Jason Swergold. Defense Counsel Jonathan Marvinny (Federal Defenders). Proceeding: Rule 9. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $500,000 PRB; 3 FRP; secured by property: Home in Manalapan, NJ; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/DNJ; surrender travel documents (& no new applications); pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; home detention; electronic monitoring; Defendant not to possess firearm/destructive device/other weapon. Defendant to be released on own signature; remaining conditions to be met by: FRPs to cosign by 1/19/2018. Security for bond to be posted by 1/26/2018. Defendant to have no contact with co-defendants except in the presence of counsel. Defendant to have no contact with known victims of or witnesses to offenses alleged in Indictment. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 1/18/2018. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 1/18/2018. (bw)
Related: [-]
19 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to Eugene Castelle (10) held on 1/12/2018. Date of Arrest: 1/12/2018, Vol. Surr. AUSA Jason Swergold. Defense Counsel Gerry McMahon Related [+]. Proceeding: Rule 9. BAIL DISPOSITION: $500,000 PRB; 2 FRP; secured by property: Brother's home, 72 Pilot St., Staten Island; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY; surrender travel documents (& no new applications); pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; Defendant to submit to urinalysis; if positive, add conditions of drug testing/treatment; home incarceration; electronic monitoring. Defendant to be released on own signature, plus the following conditions: PTS to set up electronic monitoring. Remaining conditions to be met by: FRPs to sign and passport to be surrendered by 1/19/2018. Security for bond to be posted by 1/26/2018. Defendant to have no contact with co-defendants except in the presence of counsel. Defendant to have no contact with known victims of or witnesses to offenses alleged in Indictment. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 1/18/2018. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 1/18/2018. (bw) (Main Document 19 replaced on 1/16/2018) (bw). Modified on 1/16/2018 (bw).
Related: [-] tained
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to George Tropiano (4) held on 1/12/2018. Date of Arrest: 1/12/2018. AUSA Jason Swergold. Defense Counsel John Rapawy Related [+]. Proceeding: Rule 9. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $5 million PRB; 5 FRP; secured by property: Property valued at $4 million in the aggregate; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY; surrender travel documents (& no new applications); pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; home incarceration; electronic monitoring; Defendant not to possess firearm/destructive device/other weapon. Defendant to be released on own signature. Remaining conditions to be met by: Passport to be surrendered by 1/16/2018. FRPs to co-sign bond by 1/19/2018. Security to be posted for bond by 1/26/2018. Defendant to have no contact with co-defendants except in the presence of counsel. Defendant to have no contact with known victims of or witnesses to offenses alleged in Indictment. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 1/18/2018. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 1/18/2018. (bw)
Related: [-] tained
26 26 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gerald Joseph McMahon appearing for Eugene Castelle. (jm)
Related: [-]
27 27 ORDER as to Joseph Cammarano, Jr for medical attention. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/18)(jm)
Related: [-]
30 30 ORDER as to John Zancocchio for medical atention. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/12/18)(jm)
Related: [-]
31 31 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ernest Montevecchi appointing cja attorney Leo Aldridge. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses) (jm)
Related: [-]
32 32 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Simone Esposito appointing fed defender Jonathan Marvinny. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses) (jm)
Related: [-]
33 33 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by John Zancocchio appointing cja attorney John Maringolo. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses) (jm)
Related: [-]
50 50 PRB Bond Entered as to Ernest Montevecchi in amount of $ 500,000.00. To be cosigned by two financially responsible persons: Secured by Home in NJ; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/DNJ; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Pretrial supervision as directed by pretrial services; Home incarceration; Electronic monitoring; Deft not possess firearms, destructive devices or other weapons; Deft to be released on own signature; FRPS to sign by 1/19/18; Security to be posted by 1/26/18; Deft to have no contact with co-defendants except in presence of counsel; Deft to have no contact with known victims of or witnesses to offenses charged in indictment. Advice of Penalties and sanctions attached. (jw)
Related: [-]
63 63 PRB Bond Entered as to Simone Esposito in amount of $ 500,000.00. AGREED CONDITIONS OF RELEASE: $500,000 PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE BOND; TO BE COSIGNEDBY THREE FINANCIALLY RESPONSIBLE PERSONS; SECURED BY HOME IN MANALAPAN, NJ;TRAVEL RESTRICTED TO SDNY/EDNY/DNJ; SURRENDER TRAVEL DOCUMENTS AND NO NEW APPLICATIONS; PRETRIAL SUPERVISION AS DIRECTED BY PRETRIAL SERVICES; HOME DETENTION; ELECTRONIC MONITORING; DEFT NOT POSSESS FIREARMS, DESTRUCTIVE DEVICES OR OTHER WEAPONS; DEFT TO BE RELEASED ON OWN SIGNATURE; FRPS TO COSIGN BY 1/19/18; SECURITY TO BE POSTED BY 1/26/18; DEFT TO HAVE NO CONTACT WITH CO-DEFENDANTS EXCEPT IN PRESENCE OF COUNSEL; DEFT TO HAVE NO CONTACT WITH KNOWN VICTIMS OF OR WITNESSES TO OFFENSES ALLEGED IN INDICTMENT. (ft)
Related: [-]
64 64 PRB Bond Entered as to George Tropiano in amount of $5,000,0000.00. AGREED CONDITIONS OF RELEASE: $5 MILLION PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE BOND; TO BE COSIGNED BY FIVE FINANCIALLY RESPONSIBLE PERSONS; SECURED BY PROPERTY VALUED AT $4 MILLION IN THE AGGREGATE; TRAVEL RESTRICTED TO SDNY/EDNY; SURRENDER TRAVEL DOCUMENTS AND NO NEW APPLICATIONS; PRETRIAL SUPERVISION AS DIRECTED BY PRETRIAL SERVICES; HOME INCARCERATION; ELECTRONIC MONITORING; DEFT NOT POSSESS FIREARMS, DESTRUCTIVE DEVICES OR OTHER WEAPONS; DEFT TO BE RELEASED ON OWN SIGNATURE; PASSPORT TO BE SURRENDERED BY 1/16/18; FRPS TO COSIGN BOND BY 1/19/18; SECURITY TO BE POSTED FOR BOND BY 1/26/18; DEFT TO HAVE NO CONTACT WITH CO-DEFENDANTS EXCEPT IN PRESENCE OF COUNSEL; DEFT TO HAVE NO CONTACT WITH KNOWN VICTIMS OF OR WITNESSES TO OFFENSES ALLEGED IN INDICTMENT. (ft)
Related: [-]