County of Ashtabula v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45050 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas, 2017 CV 00821 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:12 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Specialty, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Ashtabula
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
Terminated: 03/20/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:46 PM EDT |
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 Notice of Removal from Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017 CV 00821 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8503590. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action MDL No. 2804; 1:17-md-02804-DAP; 1:17-op-45000-DAP; 1:17-op-45001-DAP; 1:17-op-45002-DAP; 1:17-op-45003-DAP; 1:17-op-45004-DAP; 1:17-op-45005-DAP; 1:18-op-45012-DAP; 1:18-op-45013-DAP; 1:18-op-45031-DAP . Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Service Papers, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - MDL Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Joseph v. Baxter, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Cty. Comm's of McDowell v. McKesson, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - City of Huntington v. AmerisourceBergen | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. |