Buchanan County, Missouri v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45028 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Western, 5:17-cv-06141 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:12 PM EST |
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. n/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
MDL Notice Only
Buchanan County, Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Buchanan County, Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:40 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eric D. Barton on behalf of Buchanan County, Missouri. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-5535023. Service due by 2/27/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Barton, Eric) [Transferred from mowd on 1/12/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton.(Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from mowd on 1/12/2018.] | |
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from mowd on 1/12/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-3, from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL No. 2804. Signed on 1/10/18. Case electronically transferred. (Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from mowd on 1/12/2018.] | |
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
Judge Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804) assigned to case. (P,R) | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western. Case number 5:17-cv-06141. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |