City of Providence v. Intel Corp.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00894 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 11, 2018 3:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Intel Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Providence
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Receipt
Mon 04/23 3:51 PM
Receipt of acknowledgment - Case transferred from California Northernhas been opened in District of Oregonas case 3:18-cv-00698, filed 04/20/2018.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case - - Out of District
Thu 04/19 4:07 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the District of Oregon and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Michael H. Simon (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 03/13 10:02 AM
ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/13/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 03/09 1:34 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Intel Corp. (Day, Allison) (Filed on 3/9/2018) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 03/09 12:58 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Case Pending Resolution Of Motion For Transfer Of Actions filed by Intel Corp..(Day, Allison) (Filed on 3/9/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/09 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Marie Day (Day, Allison) (Filed on 3/9/2018) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/09 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam Kim (Kim, Miriam) (Filed on 3/9/2018) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/01 9:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Providence. Intel Corp. served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 3/1/2018) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/22 1:58 PM
(Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2018 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018) Modified text on 2/22/2018 (amkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
12 | 12
utility
Add and Terminate Judges Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 02/22 11:16 AM
Pursuant to Order 14 in CV 18-742-BLF and11 in CV 18-894-BLF:Judge Edward J. Davila is added. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 2 (2/22/2018) Duplicate entry of Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, disregard | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Relating Case
Thu 02/22 9:41 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE. It is hereby ordered that Case 5:18-cv-00046-EJD Garcia v Intel Corporation is related to Cases 5:18-cv-00742-BLF Park v Intel Corporation, and 5:18-cv-00894-BLF City of Providence v Intel, Corporation and such cases shall be reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/22/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/22 2:03 PM
***ReSet time of Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2018 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018) |
||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/13 7:07 PM
SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/13/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/13 7:05 PM
ORDER GRANTING 7 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/13/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/13 7:05 PM
ORDER GRANTING 6 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/13/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/13 8:17 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12106661.) filed by City of Providence. (Hall, Donald) (Filed on 2/13/2018) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/12 3:58 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12105593.) filed by City of Providence. (Straite, David) (Filed on 2/12/2018) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/12 2:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Intel Corp. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 02/12 2:07 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor.(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 02/12 1:49 PM
Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 02/12 11:32 AM
Proposed Summons. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 2/12/2018) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/12 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Intel Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12103727.). Filed byCity of Providence.(King, Laurence) (Filed on 2/12/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |