Franklin County Board of County Commissioners v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45162 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 12, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Southern, 2:18-cv-00077 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:13 PM EST |
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a H.D. Smith, f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Meijer, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC.
|
|
Defendant
WalMart, Inc., f/k/a/ Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Franklin County Board of County Commissioners
373 S High Street, 26th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:29 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6296664), filed by Franklin County Board of County Commissioners. (Butler, David) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/12/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:17-cv-662,2:17-cv-663,2:17-cv-664,2:17-cv-665,2:17-cv-680,2:17-cv-682,2:17-cv-696, 2:17-cv-704,2:17-cv-713,2:17-cv-723,2:17-cv-768,2:17-cv-769,2:17-cv-770,2:17-cv-883, 2:17-cv-886,2:17-cv-891,2:17-cv-894,2:17-cv-904,2:17-cv-918,2:17-cv-975,2:17-cv-1012, 2:17-cv-1024,2:17-cv-1064,2:17-cv-1097,2:17-cv-1102,2:17-cv-1105,2:17-cv-1117,2:17-cv-1126, 2:17-cv-1132,2:18-cv-37,2:18-cv-40,2:18-cv-77,2:18-cv-78 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on January 31, 2018. (jlk) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/12/2018.] | |
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 8) - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/12/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00077. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |