St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. Electronic Payment Providers, Inc. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia M Hernandez Cov |
Referred: | Julie S Sneed |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-00364 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 11, 2018 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Electronic Payment Providers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Intercept Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
82 | 82
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 04/13 8:52 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to file stipulated order or motion to reopen. (Doc. # 81 ). The deadline is now May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/13/2020. (DMD) |
|
Friday, April 10, 2020 | ||
81 | 81
motion
Extension of Time to File
Fri 04/10 10:50 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulated Final Order or Motion to Reopen the Case by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Wilson, Mark) |