Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Eduardo C Robreno
Case #: 2:18-cv-00624
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Aug 11, 2018 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
OPPENHEIMER PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By
CAROLYN BATES KELLY
Kelly & Demarco PC
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS KIRK
Represented By
JAMES A. BELL, IV
Bell & Bell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 02/06 8:44 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 02/05/2019. 02/06/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
23 23 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 02/05 4:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER Settlement Conference held on 2/5/19. (jl, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/04 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER C. BELL on behalf of THOMAS KIRK with Certificate of Service(BELL, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 12/19 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/5/2019 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER.(ti, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
20 20 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/11 3:02 PM
FIRST SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE SUBMITTED BY MARCH 11, 2019; ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY JUNE 3, 2019; ALL PRETRIAL MEMORANDA AND ANY MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY JUNE 25, 2019; AND, THIS CASE SHALL BE PLACED IN THIS COURT'S TRIAL POOL ON JULY 15, 2019, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/11/2018. 12/11/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
19 19 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/06 3:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART THE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER18 . ***AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER ATTACHED HERETO*** SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/6/2018. 12/6/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/06 11:44 AM
MOTION Entry of Confidentiality Order filed by OPPENHEIMER PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(BATES KELLY, CAROLYN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/04 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. MACEY, JR on behalf of THOMAS KIRK with Certificate of Service(MACEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 26, 2018
16 16 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/26 1:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ANY MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS AND ANY MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO JOIN OTHER PARTIES SHALL BE FILED BY 11/5/2018. FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 1/9/2019. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/6/2019. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 4/3/2019. PRETRIAL MEMORANDA PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16.1(c); AND ANY MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 4/26/2019. THE CASE SHALL BE PLACED IN THE TRIAL POOL ON 5/13/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/25/18. 10/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment Fri 10/26 1:08 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS5 IS DENIED; AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT9 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/25/18.10/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
14 14 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 10/25 4:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO Motion Hearing held on 10/25/18 Court Reporter: ESR. (ti, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 22, 2018
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/22 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. FALLS on behalf of OPPENHEIMER PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC. with 10/22/2018(FALLS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2018
12 12 misc Status Report Fri 10/19 2:52 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by THOMAS KIRK. (BELL, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2018
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/18 1:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by OPPENHEIMER PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC..(BATES KELLY, CAROLYN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 10/09 4:11 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MAY FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 19, 2018, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/9/2018. 10/9/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
9 9 3 pgs motion Leave to File Document Wed 10/03 6:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by THOMAS KIRK.Certificate of Service.(BELL, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, September 28, 2018
8 8 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 09/28 2:45 PM
ORDER THAT A HEARING TO CONSIDER DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT5 WILL BE HELD ON OCTOBER 25, 2018 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15A BEFORE THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/25/2018. 10/25/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 09/28 2:43 PM
NOTICE: A pretrial conference will be held on October 25, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15A before the HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. (nds)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
6 6 1 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/14 10:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by THOMAS KIRK.(BELL, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
5 5 motion Judgment Tue 05/01 11:25 AM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by OPPENHEIMER PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC..Order.(BATES KELLY, CAROLYN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order,
Att: 2 Statement with exhibits,
Att: 3 Memorandum Memo of Law,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Friday, April 13, 2018
4 4 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 04/13 1:59 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OFSERVICE by OPPENHEIMER PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC..(BATES KELLY, CAROLYN)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/13 1:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Oppenheimer Precision Products, Inc. to Plaintiff's Complaint by OPPENHEIMER PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC..(BATES KELLY, CAROLYN)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
2 2 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/16 3:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS KIRK. OPPENHEIMER PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC. waiver sent on 2/14/2018, answer due 4/16/2018. (BELL, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/13 3:20 PM
COMPLAINT against OPPENHEIMER PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 173445.), filed by THOMAS KIRK.(kp, ) (kp, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/13/2018) Case Management Track Form
service Summons Issued Tue 02/13 3:22 PM
1 Summons Issued as to OPPENHEIMER PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 2/13/2018 (kp, )
Related: [-]