RehabCare Group East, Inc. v. Christian Woman's Benevolent Association
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Ross |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00242 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 12, 2018 3:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
Christian Woman's Benevolent Association
|
|
Plaintiff
RehabCare Group East, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/14 4:11 PM
NOTICE Partial Waiver of Judgment Lien as to Specific Property: by Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc. (Hockett, Brian) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
misc
Remark
Fri 02/15 3:09 PM
***REMARK Registry disbursement of funds recovered in garnishment in the amount of $107332.98 payable to Christian Women's Benevolent Assocation on 02/14/2019 by US Treasury check # 94870271. (LLS) |
||
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order (Financial)
Mon 02/11 2:53 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PAY OUT OF FUNDS RECOVERED IN GARNISHMENT (Financial) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Clerk shall promptly cause $107,332.98 currently on deposit in the Court's registry to be paid out to "Christian Woman's Benevolent Association" and delivered to Christian Care Home, c/o Michael F. Flanagan, Flanagan & Associates, L.L.C., 7611 State Line Road, Suite 303, Kansas City, MO 64114. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Michael F. Flanagan is to care for the funds returned pursuant to this order in his fiduciary capacity as court-appointed receiver and to distribute the funds to the proper owners or as otherwise directed by the Circuit Court of Cole County, State of Missouri.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/11/19. (KKS) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Disbursement of Funds
Mon 02/11 11:17 AM
MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc..(Hockett, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael F. Flanagan, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Pay In Order
Wed 02/06 11:00 AM
(DOCUMENT DELETED- filed in error) Pay In Order by financial To US Bank National Association In the amount of $107,332.98. (CLO) Modified on 2/6/2019 (CLO) |
|
misc
Receipt
Thu 02/07 6:35 AM
Receipt 4644077711 in the amount of $107332.98 for GARISHMENTS on behalf of Christian Womans Benevolent (CCAM) |
||
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Answer to Garnishment Interrogatories
Mon 02/04 12:40 PM
Answer to Garnishment Interrogatories re15 Writ of Garnishment ;garnishee U.S. Bank National Association Related document:15 Writ of Garnishment (KKS) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/29 2:50 PM
NOTICE Service of Post-Judgment Discovery Requests to Defendant: by Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc. (Hockett, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
service
Marshal Return
Tue 01/22 3:37 PM
MARSHAL Return Executed party served U.S. Bank National Association, Type of return Garnishment, (KKS) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Writ of Garnishment
Fri 12/14 10:56 AM
WRIT OF EXECUTION OF GARNISHMENT issued upon the assets of CHRISTIAN WOMANS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION d/b/a CHRISTIAN CARE HOME by serving garnishee U.S. Bank National Association Packet hand delivered to USMS(KKS) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Application for Writ of Garnishment
Thu 12/13 5:02 PM
APPLICATION for Writ on garnishment w/notice and instructions to garnishee; on garnishee U.S. Bank National Association by Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc.(Hockett, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Summons to Garnishee, | ||
Att: 2 Writ of Execution, | ||
Att: 3 Interrogatories to Garnishee, | ||
Att: 4 Form USM-285 | ||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
service
Marshal Return
Mon 07/09 2:25 PM
MARSHAL Return Executed party served 6/26/18, U.S. Bank National Association, Type of return Garnishment, (KKS) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Release of Garnishment
Fri 06/29 5:30 PM
Release of Garnishment by Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc.. (Hockett, Brian) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
order
Writ of Garnishment
Thu 06/21 10:25 AM
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued upon the assets of Christian Womans Benevolent Association d/b/a Christian Care Home by serving garnishee U.S. Bank National Association ; hand delivered to USMS (KKS) |
||
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Application for Writ of Garnishment
Wed 06/20 3:17 PM
APPLICATION for Writ on garnishment w/notice and instructions to garnishee; on garnishee U.S. Bank National Association by Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc..(Hockett, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Summons to Garnishee, | ||
Att: 2 Writ of Execution, | ||
Att: 3 Interrogatories to Garnishee, | ||
Att: 4 USM Form 285 | ||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment - Default (Case)
Mon 05/07 12:40 PM
ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc., d/b/a/ RehabCare Group Therapy Services, Inc., recover of Defendant Christian Woman's Benevolent Association, d/b/a Christian Care Home, damages in the principal amount of $463,438.82; prejudgment interest through March 21, 2018 in the amount of $35,269.30; per diem interest in the amount of $8,354.72 ($177.76 for each day from March 22, 2018 through May 7, 2018); post-judgment interest from May 7, 2018 accruing at the applicable rate; attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,931.25; and costs in the amount of $457.44, for a total judgment of $511,451.53. (cc: copy of order mailed to defendant: Christian Care Home 800 Chambers Road Ferguson, Missouri 63135 ). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/7/18. (KKS) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment Case
Wed 03/28 1:52 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc..(Darrough, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Clerk's Reassignment Order (NON-CJRA)
Tue 03/20 1:17 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge David D. Noce to District Judge John A. Ross. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings. (KKS) |
|
7 | 7
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 03/20 10:27 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Christian Woman's Benevolent Association: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Christian Woman's Benevolent Association [Doc. #6 ] is GRANTED, and the default of this defendant is hereby entered. (CLO)(Copy mailed to deft at address listed on Summons Returned Executed5 ) |
|
misc
Remark
Tue 03/20 8:47 AM
***REMARK : MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default6 forwarded to Clerk/Deputy Clerk via email. (KKS) |
||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Default Entry
Mon 03/19 12:14 PM
MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Christian Woman's Benevolent Association d/b/a Christian Care Home by Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc..(Darrough, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
misc
Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance
Tue 03/06 8:58 AM
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. (JAB) |
||
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/23 3:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by RehabCare Group East, Inc.. Christian Woman's Benevolent Association served on 2/16/2018, answer due 3/9/2018. (Darrough, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Wed 02/14 6:39 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) |
|
misc
Case Opening Notification
Wed 02/14 11:02 AM
Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Matthew S. Darrough. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG) |
||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Notice of Process Server
Wed 02/14 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc. Process Server: John Hefele of St. Louis Investigation (MFG) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Tue 02/13 4:24 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff RehabCare Group East, Inc.. Parent companies: Kindred HealthCare, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Kindred HealthCare, Inc. is publicly traded as "KND" on New York Stock Exchange,. (Darrough, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/13 4:17 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Christian Woman's Benevolent Association d/b/a Christian Care Home with receipt number 0865-6380579, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by RehabCare Group East, Inc..(Darrough, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server |