California Northern District Court
Judge:Maxine M Chesney
Referred: Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:18-cv-00933
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1836(b) - Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2018
Terminated:Oct 09, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Aug 12, 2018 1:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Cytek Biosciences Inc.
Represented By
Martin S. Schenker
Cooley LLP
contact info
Dane Robert Voris
Cooley LLP
contact info
Jeffrey S. Karr
Cooley LLP
contact info
Stephen Cassidy Neal
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Zhenxiang Gong
Represented By
Allan J. Gomes
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Shane K. Anderies
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Maria Jaimes
Represented By
Allan J. Gomes
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Shane K. Anderies
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gil Reinin
Represented By
Allan J. Gomes
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Shane K. Anderies
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alfred Riley
Represented By
Allan J. Gomes
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Shane K. Anderies
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Janelle Shook
Represented By
Allan J. Gomes
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Shane K. Anderies
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Vrane
Represented By
Allan J. Gomes
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Shane K. Anderies
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ming Yan
Represented By
Allan J. Gomes
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Shane K. Anderies
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Zhang
Represented By
Allan J. Gomes
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Shane K. Anderies
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alex Zhong
Represented By
Allan J. Gomes
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Shane K. Anderies
Anderies & Gomes LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Becton, Dickinson and Company
Represented By
David S Chun
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Henry Yee-Der Huang
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Peter M. Brody
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
James R. Batchelder
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info

GPO May 21 2018
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CYTEK'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING LEAVE TO AMEND. Any amended complaint shall be filed no later than 06/08/2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/21/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
GPO Aug 21 2018
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/20/2018. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
GPO Feb 14 2019
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 14, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
GPO Jul 17 2019
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 17, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
GPO Nov 26 2019
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
GPO Feb 04 2020
Filed on 2/4/2020)ORDER GRANTING IN PART UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO CYTEK'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (
GPO Apr 15 2020
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING LEAVE TO AMEND. Cytek's motion is granted and BD's Fifth and Eighth Claims for Relief are dismissed with leave to amend to cure the deficiencies noted. BD's Third Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than May 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
GPO May 20 2020
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
GPO Oct 09 2020
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 9, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, October 09, 2020
202 202 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 10/09 3:58 PM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 9, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
201 201 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 10/08 12:21 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Becton, Dickinson and Company. (Batchelder, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
200 200 4 pgs order Order Mon 10/05 1:25 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND STAY; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. All deadlines shall remain stayed, and the hearing on Cytek's Motion to Dismiss is continued to December 4, 2020. Further, the parties are directed to file, no later than November 20, 2020, a Joint Status Report to apprise the Court as to the status of the settlement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 5, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
199 199 misc Status Report Fri 10/02 6:51 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) and Stipulation to Extend Stay and [Proposed] Order by Becton, Dickinson and Company. (Batchelder, James)
Related: [-]