Grullon v. Continental National Bank et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Referred: | Alicia M Otazo-Reyes |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-20578 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 13, 2018 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Continental National Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosanny Grullon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago |
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Order Approving21 Settlement Agreement And Dismissing Case With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval ( Responses due by 1/9/2019), Joint MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot.(Paul, Naveen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Settlement by Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot (Paul, Naveen) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Order On Mediator's Report And Denying All Pending Motions As Moot; Closing Case. Motions terminated:15 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Leave to Amend Ninth Affirmative Defense filed by Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz) |
|
19 | 19
![]() FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Marlene Quintana. Disposition: Settled in full.(Quintana, Marlene) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re15 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Leave to Amend Ninth Affirmative Defense filed by Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot.(Block, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re15 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Leave to Amend Ninth Affirmative Defense filed by Rosanny Grullon. Replies due by 10/9/2018. (Falzon, Anthony) |
|
Saturday, September 22, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Rosanny Grullon, Marlene Quintana. (Falzon, Anthony) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Leave to Amend Ninth Affirmative Defense by Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot. Responses due by 10/1/2018(Paul, Naveen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Order Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation and Referring Certain Motions to Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 5/13/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 5/9/2019 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2018., Discovery due by 1/3/2019., Expert Discovery due by 1/3/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 9/17/2018., Mediation Deadline 3/14/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 2/4/2019., Motions due by 3/29/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/23/2019.). Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/4/2018. (vmz) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Rosanny Grullon for dates of June 27 through July 9, 2018; November 15 through November 28, 2018 and December 20, 2018 through January 7, 2019 (Falzon, Anthony) |
|
12 | 12
![]() STATUS REPORT on Removal by Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot(Block, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot(Block, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Interested Parties by Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot identifying Corporate Parent Rene Azcarrete (deceased), Other Affiliate Cesar L Alvarez, Other Affiliate Manuel Machado, Other Affiliate Manuel Machado, Other Affiliate Nathan and/or Edith Weinstein (deceased), Other Affiliate Osvaldo D. & Bertha Delgado, Other Affiliate Elizabeth Dascal under F. Dascal 2014 Irrevocable Trust, Other Affiliate Magda ITF.M.Difalco Montiel Davis, Other Affiliate Carlos Muniz, Other Affiliate Rodolfo Lleonart, Other Affiliate Rodolfo Lleonart, Jr., Other Affiliate Angel Pena, Other Affiliate Aldo Coronel, Other Affiliate Joel Levine, Other Affiliate Magda M. Davis, Other Affiliate Jacqueline Dascal Chariff, Other Affiliate Ana Maria Camacho, Other Affiliate David Weck, Other Affiliate Jack Delaster, Other Affiliate Ana Maria Escagedo, Other Affiliate Alberto M. Hernandez, Other Affiliate Aleida Sotolongo, Other Affiliate Antonio and/or Marth Ramirez, Other Affiliate Antonio R. Zuccolillo, Other Affiliate Athan F. & Esther Castiglia, Other Affiliate cesar R. Camacho, Other Affiliate Fanny Dascal, Other Affiliate Trustees of the Fanny Dascal Grantor Retained Annuity Trust U/T/D 3/7/2016, Other Affiliate Jacqueline Chariff Trust under F. Dascal 2014 Irrevocable Trust, Other Affiliate Karla Dascal Trust under F. Dascal 2014 Irrevocable Trust, Other Affiliate Jonathan Chariff, Other Affiliate Claudio E. Martinez (deceased), Other Affiliate Erelio and/or Isabel Pena, Other Affiliate Eudualdo A. Suarez, Sr., Other Affiliate Falcon Investment, Inc, Other Affiliate FL Ranch Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate Gisela Garcia-Quintana, Other Affiliate Ignacio Portuondo, Other Affiliate Irma S. Mas, Other Affiliate Jaime Yuken, Other Affiliate Jose M. Corbato, Other Affiliate Jose and/or Haydee Perez, Other Affiliate Jose R. & Bertha G. Montiel, Other Affiliate Jose R. Pedre (deceased), Other Affiliate Juan Alberto Rassi, Other Affiliate Juan & Rosa Vento, Other Affiliate Julian Linares, Other Affiliate Julio A. Viyella, Other Affiliate Leonides/EstherLDiaz Hernandez, Other Affiliate Lourdes C. Sans, Other Affiliate Luis C. Estrada, Other Affiliate M.T. Cueto, Other Affiliate Madelin Escagedo Menacho, Other Affiliate Alberto Millan Menacho Escagedo, Other Affiliate Magda Montiel Davis ITF Joseph Difalco Jr., Other Affiliate Marcos M. Escagedo, Other Affiliate Mario & Martha Hernandez, Other Affiliate Mario E. Garcia, Other Affiliate Martha F. Morell, Other Affiliate Millan Escagedo, Other Affiliate Nancy and Jose Llerena, Other Affiliate Daniel M. La Fuente, Other Affiliate Ramon Mestre, Other Affiliate Ramona Aquino Hompanera, Other Affiliate Sanchez & Fernandez-Rocha, M.D., Other Affiliate Sandra Kay Perdomo, Other Affiliate Sergio & Esther Perez Pereira, Other Affiliate Sylvia Arista (deceased), Other Affiliate Sylvia Maria Portuondo, Other Affiliate Urbino Bajuelo, Other Affiliate Victor Lopez De Mendoza, Other Affiliate Wenceslao & Josefina Ortega, Other Affiliate Wilfred & Celia Chamizo, Other Affiliate A.W. Karlick,Trustee, Other Affiliate Allan Leiter, Other Affiliate Aloha Finance, Inc, Other Affiliate Bahai Corporation, Other Affiliate Bernard & Arlene Greenstein, Other Affiliate Bernice Morris, Trustee, Other Affiliate Bill Ullman, Attorney, Other Affiliate Barbara Zimmett, Other Affiliate CEDE & CO, Other Affiliate Dolores Harris Revocable Trust, Other Affiliate Ernest Harris Trust One, Other Affiliate George Lequerique, Other Affiliate Gerald D. & Marcia Z Weinstein (w/o/s) (Estate), Other Affiliate Guillen Vallejo S.L., Other Affiliate Incotrust Investment & Controlling Trust Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Joaquin Escagedo, Other Affiliate Laurie Riemer and Joanne Rosen, Other Affiliate Lawrence F. Brill (deceased), Other Affiliate Marianne R. Brandon, Other Affiliate Mitchael A. Seidle, Other Affiliate National Community Investment Fund, Other Affiliate Greater Miami Jewish Foundation, Other Affiliate Ramon Lavin, Other Affiliate Garry Brandon, Other Affiliate Todd Brandon, Other Affiliate Robert Feltman, Other Affiliate Robert M. Haber, Other Affiliate Ronald L. Fine, Other Affiliate Sonya Caplan, Other Affiliate The Estate of Arthur W. Karlick, Other Affiliate Lucia M. McTague, Other Affiliate Neil G. McTague, Other Affiliate Robert H. McTague, Jr., Other Affiliate World Business Enterprises Inc., Other Affiliate Michelle & Scott Baena Tenants by the Entireties, Other Affiliate Gabajac LLC, Other Affiliate Reinaldo F. Alonso as Trustee of the Reinaldo F. Alonso Revocable Trust u/a/d 2/18/2009, Other Affiliate Zachary H. Wolf and/or Gertrude Wolf, Other Affiliate Manuel Gonzalez Goenaga, Other Affiliate Miriam I. Perdomo, Other Affiliate Jose A. and Ana Perez, Other Affiliate Rafael Portuondo, Other Affiliate Mitchel Ginzburg, Other Affiliate Smith Barney Shearson, Inc., Other Affiliate Scott Baena, Other Affiliate Irving J. Whitman and Fay Whitman, Other Affiliate Salomon Yuken, Other Affiliate Medardo Tuchman, Other Affiliate Moises Berezdivin, Other Affiliate TransAtlantic Bank as Custodian, Other Affiliate Melvin Wolf, Other Affiliate Scott Wilson, Other Affiliate Ralph Maya, Other Affiliate James E. Glass, Other Affiliate Antonio Argiz, Other Affiliate Antonio Argiz, Other Affiliate Jose Avila (deceased), Other Affiliate Fernando Rodriguez for Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot (Paul, Naveen) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Wed 05/09 10:45 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re8 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (vmz) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Interested Parties by Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot identifying Corporate Parent Continental Bancorp for Continental National Bank(Block, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/23/2018. (dq) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/23/2018. (dq) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Rosanny Grullon for dates of April 5 through April 16, 2018 (Falzon, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental National Bank identifying Corporate Parent Continental Bancorp for Continental National Bank (Block, David) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal (Amended Complaint) by Continental National Bank, Guillermo DIaz-Rousselot. (Block, David) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 02/15 7:53 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (rms1) |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |