BK Racing, LLC
North Carolina Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | J Craig Whitley |
Case #: | 3:18-bk-30241 |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
BK Racing, LLC
6780 Hudspeth Rd
Harrisburg, NC 28075-5006 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
402 W. Trade Street Suite 200
Charlotte, NC 28202 |
GPO
Feb 14 2019
Order Denying Motion to Use Cash Collateral to Immediately Pay Pre-Sale Charter Member Fees Invoice. (Related Doc # 211) (ea) (Judgment Book) |
1. | BK Racing files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (espn.com) |
Submitted Tue 02/20/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
614 | 614
misc
Quarterly Fee Statement (Chapter 11)
Tue 04/16 11:22 AM
Chapter 11 Quarterly Fee Statement for period ending March 31, 2024 (Fee Amount $250.00) filed by Michael Leon Martinez on behalf of Matthew W. Smith. (Martinez, Michael) |
|
613 | 613
misc
Post-Confirmation Report
Tue 04/16 11:21 AM
Post Confirmation Report for March 2024 filed by Michael Leon Martinez on behalf of Matthew W. Smith. (Martinez, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 04/16 11:23 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Quarterly Fee Statement([LINK 18-30241 ) [misc,qrtFeeSt] ( 250.00). Receipt number A9780950, amount $ 250.00. (U.S. Treasury) |