Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-01362

California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher B Latham
Case #: 3:18-ap-90017
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2018
Terminated:Dec 31, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs
810 Vermont Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20420
Represented By
Jeff Sessions
contact info
Plaintiffs
Jaime Y Clavito
5100 N. Hwy 99 #76
Stockton, CA 95212
Represented By
Jaime Y Clavito
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Monday, December 31, 2018
35 35 order Closed Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/31 2:58 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
34 34 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Fri 12/21 9:22 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 12/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
33 33 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Order)(CSD 3039, 3040, other) Wed 12/19 1:28 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding 3:2018-ap-90017-CL; with BNC Service. Signed on 12/19/2018 Related [+] (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 32 Minute Order
Monday, December 17, 2018
32 32 order Minute Order - manual entry Tue 12/18 6:55 PM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 12/17/2018. MATTER: STATUS CONFERENCE (RE COMPLAINT) (fr. 11/19/18). DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. Related [+] (McGrew, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, December 13, 2018
30 30 misc Report Thu 12/13 12:02 PM
United States Department of Veterans Affairs' Status Report filed by Glen F. Dorgan on behalf of U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs. (Dorgan, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
31 31 misc Report Thu 12/13 4:59 PM
Status Report filed by Jaime Ylasco Clavito. Related [+] (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 29 Minute Order
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 19, 2018
29 29 order Minute Order - manual entry Tue 11/20 10:29 AM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 11/19/2018. MATTER: STATUS CONFERENCE (RE COMPLAINT) (fr. 9/24/18). DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. STATUS CONFERENCE (RE COMPLAINT) Scheduled for 12/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse. Related [+] (McGrew, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, November 15, 2018
28 28 misc Report Thu 11/15 11:09 AM
Status Report filed by Glen F. Dorgan on behalf of U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs. (Dorgan, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 24, 2018
27 27 order Minute Order - manual entry Tue 09/25 2:18 PM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 09/24/2018. MATTER: STATUS CONFERENCE (RE COMPLAINT). DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. STATUS CONFERENCE (RE COMPLAINT) Scheduled for 11/19/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse. Related [+] (McGrew, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, September 17, 2018
26 26 misc Report Mon 09/17 4:34 PM
United States Department of Veterans Affairs' Status Report filed by Glen F. Dorgan on behalf of U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs. (Dorgan, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
25 25 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Fri 03/30 9:22 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 03/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order to Schedule/Continue Hearing
24 24 order Schedule/Continue Hearing (Order) Wed 03/28 4:05 PM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding; with Service by BNC HEARING Scheduled for 9/24/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse . Related [+] Signed on 3/28/2018. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, March 23, 2018
21 21 misc Report Fri 03/23 8:10 AM
Status Report filed by Glen F. Dorgan on behalf of U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs. Related [+] (Dorgan, Glen)
Related: [-] 20 Report
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, March 22, 2018
23 23 motion Summary Judgment (Motion) Fri 03/23 10:15 AM
(1) Motion for Summary Judgment and/or (2) Application to Enter Default filed by Jaime Y Clavito. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support
Att: 3 Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support
Att: 4 Plaintiff's Declaration in Support
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
22 22 motion Default (Request)(CSD 3030) Fri 03/23 10:05 AM
Request to Enter Default with Declaration of Mailing, Memorandum of Costs and if applicable Declaration of Non- Military Status. Filed by Jaime Y Clavito. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Report Thu 03/22 4:45 PM
Status Report filed by Jaime Y Clavito. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/21 10:15 AM
Answer to Complaint , Amendment to Complaint, and Supplement to Complaint Related [+], Answer to Complaint filed by Glen F. Dorgan of United States Attorneys Office on behalf of U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs. (Dorgan, Glen)
Related: [-] 5 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
18 18 cmp Return of Summons Served Tue 03/20 3:49 PM
Amended Summons Served on: U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs Secretary David J. Shulkin, Attorney General Jeff B. Sessions, U.S. Attorney Adam Braverman, U.S. Attorney Glen F Dorgan. Served On 2/14/18 filed by Jaime Y Clavito. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
15 15 court Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) Mon 03/12 12:17 PM
Amended Summons Issued on U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs. Answer Due 4/11/2018; Certificate of Service. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 09, 2018
17 17 order Restrict Public Access (Order)(paperless entry) auto Mon 03/12 12:29 PM
Order Granting Motion To Restrict Public Access signed on 3/9/2018. (Admin)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Restrict Public Access (Motion)(fee) Mon 03/12 12:29 PM
Motion for Reducation, Restrict Access of Electronic Access and Authorize the Filing of Replacement Document Related [+] Fee Amount $ 25.00 filed by Jaime Y Clavito. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint1 Complaint
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/12 12:04 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Jaime Y Clavito. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 12 Adversary Proceeding Sheet,13 Statement, Amended Summons
13 13 trustee Statement Mon 03/12 12:02 PM
Plaintiff's Supplement to Complaint filed by Jaime Y Clavito. Related [+] (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 5 Complaint
12 12 cmp Adversary Proceeding Sheet (B1040) Mon 03/12 11:57 AM
Amended Adversary Proceeding Sheet. Related [+] Filed by Jaime Y Clavito. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
11 11 court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Mon 03/12 8:35 AM
Receipt of Motion Filing Fee - $25.00 by KD. Receipt Number 232424. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
10 10 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Thu 03/01 9:28 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 03/01/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Errors/Deficiencies
9 9 court Errors/Deficiencies (BNC) Tue 02/27 2:32 PM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. Related [+] (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 5 Complaint
Monday, February 26, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/27 12:47 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Jaime Y Clavito. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 5 Complaint,6 Notice (miscellaneous)
7 7 misc Exhibit Tue 02/27 12:45 PM
Exhibits filed by Jaime Y Clavito. Related [+] (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Complaint,6 Notice (miscellaneous)
Att: 1 Exhibits Part 2
Att: 2 Exhibits Part 3
6 6 notice Miscellaneous (Document/Notice) Tue 02/27 12:43 PM
Plaintiff's Supplement to Complaint filed by Jaime Y Clavito. Related [+] (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Complaint
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/27 11:01 AM
Amendment to Complaint by Jaime Y Clavito against U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs Related [+] filed by Jaime Y Clavito. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
4 4 cmp Return of Summons Served Wed 02/14 5:25 PM
Summons Served on: U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs . Served On 2/14/18 filed by Jaime Y Clavito . (Lewis, L.)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) Wed 02/14 5:24 PM
Summons Issued on U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs Answer Due 3/16/2018; Certificate of Service (Lewis, L.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice ~Generic~ Document Wed 02/14 5:21 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Related [+] filed by Jaime Y Clavito . (Lewis, L.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 02/14 4:13 PM
Adversary case 18-90017 Complaint by Jaime Y Clavito against U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs. Nature of Suit: 63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan) 65 (Dischargeability - other) , Fee Amount $ 0.00 Filed by Jaime Y Clavito. (Lewis, L.) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2018 (Lewis, L.). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2018 (Lewis, L.). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2018 (Lewis, L.)
Related: [-]