New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00036
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2018
Terminated:Dec 04, 2020
Last checked: Friday Feb 16, 2018 3:11 AM EST
Defendant
David Britt (3)
Represented By
Matthew Raffi Shahabian
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (nyc)
contact info
Melinda Lee Haag
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (san Francisco)
contact info
Robert M. Stern
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Cynthia Holder (4)
Represented By
Emily Joy Mathieu
Thompson Hine Llp (nyc)
contact info
Norman Arthur Bloch
Thompson Hine Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
David Middendorf (1)
Represented By
Gregory Scott Bruch
Bruch Hanna LLP
contact info
Amy Ruth Lester
Petrillo Klein & Boxer LLP
contact info
Nelson Andrew Boxer
Petrillo Klein & Boxer LLP
contact info
Alexandra Rebecca Clark
Petrillo Klein & Boxer LLP
contact info
Khiran Sidhu
Bruch Hanna LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Wada (5)
Represented By
Justin S. Weddle
Brown Rudnick Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Whittle (2)
Represented By
James Herron Bicks
Wiggin & Dana, Llp(ct)
contact info
James Glasser
Wiggin & Dana, Llp(ct)
contact info
Bradley Joseph Bondi
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Nola Breglio Heller
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (st Andw'S)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rebecca Gabrielle Mermelstein
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (st Andw'S)
contact info
Amanda Kay Kramer
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (st Andw'S)
contact info
Jessica Greenwood
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info


1. KPMG Ex-Partner Goes on Trial in 'Steal the Exam' Scandal (wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 02/12/2019
Docket last updated: 03/03/2022 1:38 PM EST
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-5, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-5, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3-5, Sealed Defendant 4 (4) count(s) 1, 2, 4-5, Sealed Defendant 5 (5) count(s) 1, 2, 4-5. (jm)
Related: [-]