New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:18-cv-01428
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2018
Terminated:May 10, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 15, 2018 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Brian William Brokate
Gibney, Anthony & Flaherty, LLP
contact info
Robert Jeremiah Tracy
Gibney, Anthony & Flaherty, LLP
contact info
Adam Wallace Sgro
Gibney, Anthony & Flaherty, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Braulio Thorne
Represented By
Daniel Chaim Cohen
Daniel Cohen PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 10, 2018
13 13 1 pgs order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/10 6:35 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties, the complaint against defendant Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. in this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without fees or costs to any party as against the other, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. All conferences are cancelled. All motions are moot. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/10/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/18 3:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(Tracy, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/18 3:15 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Rolex Industries, Inc. for Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(Tracy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
10 10 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/26 3:22 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR MOVE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties, that the time for defendant Rolex Watch, U.S.A., Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the summons and complaint in this action is extended from March 27, 2018 up to and including April 18, 2018. (Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. answer due 4/18/2018.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/26/2018) (ras)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/26 12:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Jeremiah Tracy on behalf of Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Tracy, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/26 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Wallace Sgro on behalf of Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Sgro, Adam)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/26 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian William Brokate on behalf of Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Brokate, Brian)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/26 10:43 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018. Service was accepted by ROBERT B, GENERAL AGENT. Document filed by Braulio Thorne. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 02/21 8:40 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. (pne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
4 4 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 02/20 5:04 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on May 17, 2018 at 4:45 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. (Initial Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/20/2018) (ras)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 02/20 12:27 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Chaim Cohen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:12188. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331ot. (pne)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/20 12:28 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 02/20 12:29 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 02/20 12:29 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pne)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/16 3:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Braulio Thorne. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/16 3:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/16 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14712001)Document filed by Braulio Thorne.(Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]