California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:18-cv-01305
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2018
Terminated:May 29, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 15, 2018 1:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Moses Babazadeh
Defendant
David Baradarian
Defendant
Downtown Prime, LLC
Defendant
Donegan McQuaig
Defendant
Quixotic Realty, Inc.
Defendant
Michael Schenk
Defendant
Shahram Shamsian
Defendant
Pedram Yadidsion
Plaintiff
The Burlington Insurance Company
Represented By
Andrew Philip Collier
Pacific Law Partners LLP
contact info
David B A Demo
Pacific Law Partners LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/29 12:30 PM
NOTICE filed by Plaintiff The Burlington Insurance Company. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Demo, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/14 9:11 AM
NOTICE Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Plaintiff The Burlington Insurance Company. (Demo, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
9 9 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 02/20 11:54 AM
Amended Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Burlington Insurance Company, (Demo, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 02/20 9:39 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/16 4:26 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Moses Babazadeh, David Baradarian, Downtown Prime, LLC, Donegan McQuaig, Quixotic Realty, Inc., Michael Schenk, Shahram Shamsian, Pedram Yadidsion. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 02/16 4:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 02/16 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/16 3:29 PM
NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Burlington Insurance Company The. Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Demo, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/16 3:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Burlington Insurance Company The. (Demo, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Fri 02/16 3:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Burlington Insurance Company The. (Demo, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/16 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21277248 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Burlington Insurance Company The. (Attorney David B A Demo added to party Burlington Insurance Company The(pty:pla))(Demo, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint