County of Lorain v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45078 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Lorain County Court of Common Pleas, 17 CV 194035 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:14 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Specialty, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Prescription Supply, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Discount Drug Mart
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John N. Kapoor
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Lorain
226 Middle Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
Terminated: 03/24/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:10 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 Notice of Removal from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas, case number 17 CV 194035 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8511553. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP; 1:17-op-45000-DAP; 1:17-op-45001-DAP; 1:17-op-45002-DAP; 1:17-op-45003-DAP; 1:17-op-45004-DAP; 1:17-op-45005-DAP; 1:18-op-45012-DAP; 1:18-op-45013-DAP; 1:18-op-45031-DAP . Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Service Papers, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - MDL Transfer Order | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. |