Local 90 IBEW Benefits Plan v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45069 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Connecticut, 3:17-cv-02095 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:14 PM EST |
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Local 90 IBEW Benefits Plan
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Lynn Webster
Terminated: 10/16/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
Terminated: 10/16/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
Terminated: 10/16/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/01/2019 12:57 PM EDT |
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from ctd on 1/19/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 88 pgs COMPLAINT by IBEW Local 90 Benefits Plan against Purdue Pharma, LP ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4649247.), filed by IBEW Local 90 Benefits Plan.(Cheverie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 1/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/18/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2018 Discovery due by 6/19/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2018 Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2017.(Anastasio, F.) [Transferred from ctd on 1/19/2018.] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/18/2017.(Anastasio, F.) [Transferred from ctd on 1/19/2018.] | |
4 | 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/18/2017.(Anastasio, F.) [Transferred from ctd on 1/19/2018.] | |
5 | 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/18/2017.(Anastasio, F.) [Transferred from ctd on 1/19/2018.] | |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,4 Protective Order,3 Electronic Filing Order,1 Complaint filed by IBEW Local 90 Benefits Plan,5 Order Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2017.(Anastasio, F.) [Transferred from ctd on 1/19/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that all remaining claims be remanded to its respective transferor court re: 17cv2095 (JCH) Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk on 1/17/2018. (Lewis, D) [Transferred from ctd on 1/19/2018.] | |
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Connecticut. Case number 3:17-cv-02095. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |