New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Referred: James L Cott
Case #: 1:18-cv-01598
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12188 Americans With Disabilities Act - Civil Enforcement Actions
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2018
Terminated:Aug 06, 2018
Last checked: Monday Aug 20, 2018 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Signature Bank
Represented By
Roy W. Arnold
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Jennifer Lynn Achilles
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Cedric Bishop
Represented By
Joseph H Mizrahi
Cohen & Mizrahi LLP
contact info
Daniel Chaim Cohen
Daniel Cohen PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, August 06, 2018
16 16 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/06 2:36 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Signature Bank and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Cedric Bishop. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/17 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roy W. Arnold on behalf of Signature Bank. (Arnold, Roy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/12 12:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants' website is, however, not designed to be read by screen-reading software. Because of this, Plaintiff Bishop encountered multiple barriers that denied him access to the website and retail stores equal to sighted individuals. Estimated time of trial is 2-3 days, if no class is certified. Plaintiff has requested a jury trial. Motions due by 9/6/2018. Deposition due by 9/6/2018. Discovery due by 8/7/2018. Pretrial Order due by 9/6/2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 4/11/2018) (kgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/11 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Chaim Cohen on behalf of Cedric Bishop. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/05 9:52 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Roy W. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 04/05 6:19 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 11 MOTION for Roy W. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14900123. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/04 4:27 PM
MOTION for Roy W. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14900123. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Signature Bank.(Achilles, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 29, 2018
10 10 4 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 03/29 3:39 PM
ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: Initial Conference set for 4/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 3/29/2018) (kgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/28 4:29 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Signature Bank.(Achilles, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/28 4:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Signature Bank.(Achilles, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/28 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lynn Achilles on behalf of Signature Bank. (Achilles, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/08 4:57 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/08/2018) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 02/22 10:23 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Signature Bank. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 02/22 10:21 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 02/22 10:22 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 02/22 10:22 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/21 4:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Signature Bank, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Cedric Bishop. (Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/21 4:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/21 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Signature Bank. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14726174)Document filed by Cedric Bishop.(Mizrahi, Joseph)
Related: [-]