Bonadona v. Louisiana College et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Dee D Drell |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00224 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Feb 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2020 |
Case in other court: | 5CCA, 19-30764 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 20, 2018 4:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rick Brewer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louisiana College
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Bonadona
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed against Louisiana College president over refusal to hire coach due to his Jewish heritage (bayoubrief.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/22/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
70 | 70
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Wed 01/29 2:27 PM
ORDER granting69 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss in it's entirety. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 1/29/2020. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
69 | 69
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Tue 01/28 1:59 PM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Lawsuit by Rick Brewer, Louisiana College, R S U I Indemnity Co, Joshua Bonadona.(Attorney Darren A Patin added to party R S U I Indemnity Co(pty:dft))(aty,Patin, Darren) Modified on 1/28/2020 to add filer (Jones, P). |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order |