Maryland District Court
Judge:Charles B Day
Case #: 8:18-cv-00534
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2018
Terminated:May 09, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 21, 2018 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Inder S Bain
6013 Riggs Road
Laytonsville, MD 20882
Represented By
Clifford Burnett Glover, III
Mcnamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Grennan & Lynch, P.A.
contact info
Charles H Henderson
Mcnamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Kamaljit K Bain
6013 Riggs Road
Laytonsville, MD 20882
Represented By
Clifford Burnett Glover, III
Mcnamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Grennan & Lynch, P.A.
contact info
Charles H Henderson
Mcnamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Microfit Auto Parts, Inc.
10726 Tucker Street
Beltsville, MD 20705
Represented By
Clifford Burnett Glover, III
Mcnamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Grennan & Lynch, P.A.
contact info
Charles H Henderson
Mcnamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Cabrera
Represented By
Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Howard B Hoffman Attorney At Law
contact info
Jordan Song En Liew
Howard B. Hoffman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Tony Dominguez
On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated 6924 18th Avenue
Hyattsville, MD 20783
Represented By
Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Howard B Hoffman Attorney At Law
contact info
Jordan Song En Liew
Howard B. Hoffman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Maximo Hernandez
Represented By
Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Howard B Hoffman Attorney At Law
contact info
Jordan Song En Liew
Howard B. Hoffman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Munoz
Represented By
Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Howard B Hoffman Attorney At Law
contact info
Jordan Song En Liew
Howard B. Hoffman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Edwin Ochoa
Represented By
Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Howard B Hoffman Attorney At Law
contact info
Jordan Song En Liew
Howard B. Hoffman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Kunauth Persaud
Represented By
Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Howard B Hoffman Attorney At Law
contact info
Jordan Song En Liew
Howard B. Hoffman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerado Ventura
On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated 3690 Sellman Road
Beltsville, MD 20705
Represented By
Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Howard B Hoffman Attorney At Law
contact info
Jordan Song En Liew
Howard B. Hoffman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Areberth Gomez Gonzalez
Represented By
Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Howard B Hoffman Attorney At Law
contact info
Jordan Song En Liew
Howard B. Hoffman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Asdruval Hernandez
Represented By
Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Howard B Hoffman Attorney At Law
contact info
Jordan Song En Liew
Howard B. Hoffman, Attorney At Law
contact info

GPO Feb 04 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 2/4/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
45 45 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/30 7:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford W Warbasse on behalf of All Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 8:19-cv-00984-TDC, 8:18-cv-00534-CBD, 8:19-cv-00997-TDC(Warbasse, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 05, 2019
44 44 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Sun 05/05 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tony Dominguez (Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
43 43 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment Fri 02/15 12:27 PM
Order Correcting Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 2/14/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
42 42 motion Alter/Amend Judgment Wed 02/13 10:01 PM
Consent MOTION to Alter/Amend Judgment (Motion for an Order Correcting Final Judgment) by Kevin Cabrera, Tony Dominguez, Milton Fuentes, Areberth Gomez Gonzalez, Asdruval Hernandez, Maximo Hernandez, Jose Munoz, Edwin Ochoa, Kunauth Persaud, Gerado Ventura(Liew, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 04, 2019
41 41 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 02/04 2:54 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting33 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 2/4/2019. (Day, Charles)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Order on Motion for Other Relief Mon 02/04 2:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting37 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 2/4/2019. (Day, Charles)
Related: [-]
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Mon 02/04 2:47 PM
ORDER granting36 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 2/4/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
38 38 15 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 02/04 2:34 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 2/4/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
37 37 motion Other Relief Fri 01/25 2:49 PM
MOTION for Other Relief Joint Motion to Withdraw Acceptances of Offers of Judgements by Microfit Auto Parts, Inc.(Henderson, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order
36 36 motion Settlement Fri 01/25 11:29 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement (Approval of FLSA Settlement Agreement) by Tony Dominguez(Liew, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3-A,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
35 35 order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 01/23 9:46 AM
ORDER granting34 Motion to Stay. This matter is stayed until April 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 1/23/2019. (Day, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
34 34 motion Stay Tue 01/22 2:49 PM
MOTION to Stay all Deadlines by Microfit Auto Parts, Inc.(Henderson, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order
Monday, January 07, 2019
33 33 motion Leave to File Document Mon 01/07 4:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Collective Action Complaint by Tony Dominguez(Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed First Amended Collective Action Complaint,
Att: 2 Attachment Proposed First Amended Collective Action Complaint (REDLINE),
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 24, 2018
32 32 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Mon 12/24 6:02 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Asdruval Hernandez(Liew, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
31 31 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Mon 12/24 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Areberth Gomez Gonzalez(Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 29, 2018
30 30 order Order Thu 11/29 5:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER ADOPTING29 the proposed Scheduling Order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 11/29/2018. (Day, Charles)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Status Report Thu 11/29 4:49 PM
STATUS REPORT Line (Plaintiffs' Request to Lift the Stay and Issue Proposed Scheduling Order By Consent) by Kevin Cabrera, Tony Dominguez, Milton Fuentes, Areberth Gomez Gonzalez, Asdruval Hernandez, Maximo Hernandez, Jose Munoz, Edwin Ochoa, Kunauth Persaud, Gerado Ventura(Liew, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, November 16, 2018
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 11/16 4:37 PM
Settlement Conference held on 11/15/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jillyn K. Schulze. (jmm, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
28 28 2 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Thu 10/11 4:08 PM
LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for Thursday, November 15, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jillyn K. Schulze on 10/11/2018. (jmm, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 13, 2018
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/13 5:45 PM
NOTICE by Milton Fuentes (Opt-In Notice Per 29 USC § 216(b)) (Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 30, 2018
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/30 5:01 PM
NOTICE by Asdruval Hernandez (Opt-In Notice Per 29 USC § 216(b)) (Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/28 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Song En Liew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Liew, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 22, 2018
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Certify Class Fri 06/22 2:53 PM
ORDER approving the Proposed Class Notice; approving the Proposed Opt-in Notice; directing the Defendant to produce a list of employees within 14 days; notifying potential class members to file an Opt-in Notice within 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 6/21/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
23 23 motion Certify Class Tue 06/19 1:30 PM
MOTION to Certify Class (Unopposed by Defendants) by Tony Dominguez(Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 18, 2018
22 22 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 06/18 12:12 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze for Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 6/18/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 06/18 11:36 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 6/18/2018. (Day, Charles)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Stay Mon 06/18 9:28 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Request for Early Settlement Conference by Inder S Bain, Kamaljit K Bain(Henderson, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 01, 2018
19 19 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/01 12:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 5/31/2018.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Discovery Policy Memorandum
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
18 18 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/29 9:41 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/29/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
17 17 corresp Magistrate Judge - consent to Tue 05/29 8:41 AM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Henderson, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 28, 2018
16 16 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 05/28 10:40 PM
QC NOTICE:15 Notice (Other) filed by Microfit Auto Parts, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Refile using the Civil Event - Correspondence - Magistrate Judge-consent to. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 24, 2018
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/24 4:03 PM
NOTICE by Microfit Auto Parts, Inc. General Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge (Henderson, Charles)
Related: [-]
14 14 corresp Magistrate Judge - consent to Thu 05/24 3:19 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
13 13 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 03/29 11:12 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Microfit Auto Parts, Inc. (Glover, Clifford)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/29 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H Henderson on behalf of Microfit Auto Parts, Inc., Kamaljit K Bain, Inder S Bain. (Henderson, Charles) Modified filers on 3/29/2018 (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/27 4:43 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Inder S Bain, Kamaljit K Bain, Microfit Auto Parts, Inc..(Glover, Clifford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 15, 2018
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/15 6:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Dominguez. Kamaljit K Bain served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018.(Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/15 6:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Dominguez. Inder S Bain served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018.(Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/15 6:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Dominguez. Microfit Auto Parts, Inc. served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018.(Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 02/23 5:29 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Inder S Bain, Kamaljit K Bain, Microfit Auto Parts, Inc.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/22 3:13 PM
NOTICE by Maximo Hernandez re1 Complaint,, (Opt-In Notice Per 29 USC § 216(b)) (Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/22 3:12 PM
NOTICE by Kevin Cabrera re1 Complaint,, (Opt-In Notice Per 29 USC § 216(b)) (Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/22 3:10 PM
NOTICE by Edwin Ochoa re1 Complaint,, (Opt-In Notice Per 29 USC § 216(b)) (Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/22 3:09 PM
NOTICE by Arebarth Gomez Gonzalez re1 Complaint,, (Opt-In Notice Per 29 USC § 216(b)) (Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/22 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT (Collective Action Complaint Under the FLSA) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7170708.), filed by Tony Dominguez, Gerado Ventura, Jose Munoz, Kunauth Persaud.(Hoffman, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Proposed Summons - Microfit Auto Parts,
Att: 2 Supplement Proposed Summons - K. Bain,
Att: 3 Supplement Proposed Summons - I. Bain,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Supplement Opt-In Notice (T. Dominguez),
Att: 6 Supplement Opt-In Notice (K. Persaud),
Att: 7 Supplement Opt-In Notice (J. Munoz),
Att: 8 Supplement Opt-In Notice (G. Ventura)