First Texas Products, LLC et al v. Deteknix Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Manuel L Real |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01468 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 21, 2018 1:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Mao Quan Deng
20255 VEJAR RD
Walnut, CA 91789 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deteknix Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
First Texas Products Corporation
1100 Pendale Road
El Paso, TX 79907 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
First Texas Products, LLC
1100 Pendale Road
El Paso, TX 79907 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
55 | 55
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 04/09 11:33 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Stipulation54 , it is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' causes of action against Defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Parties shall bear their own costs and expenses. (gk) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
54 | 54
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 04/05 2:01 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Plaintiffs causes of action against Defendants have been settled and compromised filed by Plaintiffs First Texas Products Corporation, First Texas Products, LLC.(Jaeger, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |