New York Southern District Court
Judge:George B Daniels
Case #: 1:18-cv-01678
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12188 Americans With Disabilities Act - Civil Enforcement Actions
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2018
Terminated:May 01, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 22, 2018 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Porsche Design of America, Inc.
Represented By
Corey Anthony Lee
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Peter Daniel Mustalish
Hunton & Williams, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Braulio Thorne
Represented By
Daniel Chaim Cohen
Daniel Cohen PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
20 20 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/11 9:38 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and their respective counsel, that the above-entitled action against Defendant, shall be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, or disbursements, or attorneys' fees to any party, pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. So ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/10/2018) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
19 19 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Tue 05/01 10:56 AM
ORDER: This Court having been advised by the parties that they have reached agreement on all issues in this matter, the Clerk of Court is hereby ORDERED to close the above-captioned action, without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if an application to restore is made within thirty (30) days. The conference previously scheduled for May 24, 2018, is adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/1/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 04/30 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Braulio Thorne. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
17 17 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/25 11:11 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:16 Letter filed by Braulio Thorne. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to May 24, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 5/24/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/25/2018) (ap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
16 16 misc Letter Tue 04/24 5:28 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Daniel Cohen dated 4/24/2018 re: Adjournment of Conference. Document filed by Braulio Thorne.(Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 23, 2018
15 15 discov Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report Mon 04/23 2:17 PM
RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Porsche Design of America, Inc..(Mustalish, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
14 14 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/11 1:39 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche AG, Corporate Parent Porsche Lizenz- U. Handelsgesellschaft MBH & Co. KG, Corporate Parent Porsche Holding Stuttgart GmbH, Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Porsche Design of America, Inc.. Document filed by Porsche Design of America, Inc..(Mustalish, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 04/04 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Corey Anthony Lee on behalf of Porsche Design of America, Inc.. New Address: Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP, 1111 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2500, Miami, FL, USA 33131, 305-536-2749. (Lee, Corey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/03 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Daniel Mustalish on behalf of Porsche Design of America, Inc.. (Mustalish, Peter)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/03 2:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Corey Anthony Lee on behalf of Porsche Design of America, Inc.. (Lee, Corey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
10 10 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 04/02 1:46 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:8 Letter filed by Porsche Design of America, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Porsche Design of America, Inc. answer due 5/2/2018.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/2/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/29 5:04 PM
FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Porsche Lizenz- U. Handelsgesellschaft MBH & Co. KG for Porsche Design of America, Inc.. Document filed by Porsche Design of America, Inc..(Mustalish, Peter) Modified on 3/29/2018 (lb)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Thu 03/29 4:57 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Peter Mustalish dated March 29, 2018 re: extension of time until May 2, 2018 to respond to the complaint. Document filed by Porsche Design of America, Inc..(Mustalish, Peter)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Thu 03/29 6:00 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Peter Daniel Mustalish to RE-FILE Document 9 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
7 7 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/20 3:51 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Porsche Design of America, Inc. served on 3/12/2018, answer due 4/2/2018. Service was accepted by SATTIE JAIRAM, LEGAL CLERK. Document filed by Braulio Thorne. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/05 1:03 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Porsche Design of America, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Braulio Thorne. Related document:1 Complaint.(Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
5 5 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 02/26 3:53 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/26/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/26/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 02/26 12:30 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Porsche Design of America, Inc. (pne)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 02/26 10:31 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 02/26 10:32 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 02/26 10:32 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/23 12:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Porsche Design of America, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Braulio Thorne. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/23 12:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/23 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Porsche Design of America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14735971)Document filed by Braulio Thorne.(Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]