Cherokee County, Alabama v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45207 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 4:18-cv-00172 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:15 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Cherokee County, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/12/2020 4:10 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 173 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cherokee County, Alabama.(MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/22/2018.] | |
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/22/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601086616 (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/22/2018.] | ||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Ohio Northern for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk sent to Clerk of Court in District of Ohio Northern.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/22/18. (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/22/2018.] | |
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 4:18-cv-00172. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |