Pitt County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45208 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 4:18-cv-00018 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:15 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Pitt County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:34 PM EDT |
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4386278.), filed by Pitt County. (Seagle, J.) [Transferred from nced on 2/22/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Pitt County. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 2/22/2018.] | ||
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 2/22/2018.] | ||
Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 2/22/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 2/22/2018.] | ||
SECOND Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 2/22/2018.] | ||
SECOND Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 2/22/2018.] | ||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 2/22/2018.) (Briggeman, N.) [Transferred from nced on 2/22/2018.] | |
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Eastern. Case number 4:18-cv-00018. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |