California Southern District Court
Judge:Dana M Sabraw
Referred: Jan M Adler
Case #: 3:18-cv-00422
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:0271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2018
Terminated:Oct 04, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 22, 2018 2:29 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
1Ready, LLC
Represented By
John L Smaha
Smaha Law Group, Apc
contact info
Boris Zelkind
Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By
James Sakaguchi
Vista Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Neal Matthew Cohen
Vista Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
1Ready, LLC
Represented By
John L Smaha
Smaha Law Group, Apc
contact info
Boris Zelkind
Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By
James Sakaguchi
Vista Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Neal Matthew Cohen
Vista Ip Law Group LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 04, 2018
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 10/04 11:24 AM
ORDER Granting Related [+] Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. This Action shall be deemed dismissed with prejudice. 2. Plaintiffs' counsel to give notice of this Order and to the ENE Conference to any parties responding to the complaint after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/4/2018. (aef)(jrd)
Related: [-] Doc. No.19
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
19 19 motion Dismiss Wed 10/03 3:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Entire Action with Prejudice by 1Ready, LLC.(Smaha, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/03 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG and 1Ready, LLC, dismissing entire action (Cohen, Neal)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
17 17 minutes ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 06/01 10:16 AM
Minute Entry by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: At the request of the parties, Early Neutral Evaluation Conference continued to 8/15/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. (no document attached) (cdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 24, 2018
16 16 1 pgs order Order to Substitute Attorney Fri 05/25 7:51 AM
ORDER to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/24/2018.(aef)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/11 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Sakaguchi on behalf of Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG (Sakaguchi, James)Attorney James Sakaguchi added to party Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG(pty:pla), Attorney James Sakaguchi added to party Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG(pty:cd) (aef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 10, 2018
14 14 3 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 05/10 12:09 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference in Patent Case. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 6/20/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/9/2018.(aef)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
13 13 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 04/27 6:02 PM
ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG.(Cohen, Neal)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 04/27 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by 1Ready, LLC . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Zelkind, Boris)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 04/27 2:18 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG by 1Ready, LLC.(Zelkind, Boris)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/29 10:10 AM
ORDER Granting9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for 1Ready, LLC to Respond to Complaint. The time for Defendant 1Ready, LLC to respond to the Complaint shall be extended up to and including April 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/29/2018. (aef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/28 2:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by 1Ready, LLC. (Zelkind, Boris)Attorney Boris Zelkind added to party 1Ready, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/14 7:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG. 1Ready, LLC served. (Cohen, Neal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
7 7 order Order of Judge Transfer Tue 03/06 3:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Judge William Q. Hayes has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv422 DMS (JMA).(no document attached) (jcj)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number Rule Tue 03/06 11:03 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:17-cv-01434-WQH-JMA. The new case number is 18cv422 WQH-JMA. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/5/2018. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/5/2018.(acc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 01, 2018
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 03/01 8:57 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
4 4 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 02/23 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG of case(s) 17-cv-1434-WQH-JMA re1 Complaint. (sjm)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 02/23 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG re1 Complaint,. No Parties With Financial Interest. (sjm)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM Fri 02/23 3:26 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *6,513,524* cc:USPTO (sjm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/23 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 1Ready, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10947846), filed by Storz & Bickel GmbH & Co. KG. The new case number is 3:18-cv-422-AJB-JLB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Neal M. Cohen)(sjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet