Fallbrook Technologies International Co.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10384
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10384
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-10385 |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Fallbrook Technologies International Co.
505 Cypress Creek Rd Ste L
Cedar Park, TX 78613-4430 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 06/28 8:42 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM) |
||
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Final Decree Closing Certain Cases And Amending Caption of Remaining Case Signed on 6/27/2018 (CAF) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch D, Sch E-F, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities,. Filed by Fallbrook Technologies International Co.. (Luton Chapman, Jaime) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Fallbrook Technologies International Co.. (Luton Chapman, Jaime) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Fallbrook Technologies International Co.. (Luton Chapman, Jaime) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Tue 02/27 2:51 PM
Order Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Fallbrook Technologies Inc., Fallbrook Technologies International Co., Hodyon, Inc., and Hodyon Finance, Inc. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Fallbrook Technologies Inc., Case No. 18-10384 (MFW), should be consulted for all matters concerning this case. Order Signed on 2/27/2018. (LMC) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/26 9:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-10385 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8769573, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Fallbrook Technologies International Co.. (Enos, Kenneth) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 02/26 9:00 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (BA) |