Hodyon Finance, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10384
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10384
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-10387 |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Hodyon Finance, Inc.
505 Cypress Creek Rd Ste L
Cedar Park, TX 78613-4430 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 07/09 8:31 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM) |
||
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Final Decree
Wed 06/27 2:01 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain Cases And Amending Caption of Remaining Case Signed on 6/27/2018 (CAF) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 03/26 5:37 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Hodyon Finance, Inc.. (Luton Chapman, Jaime) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 03/26 5:37 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Hodyon Finance, Inc.. (Luton Chapman, Jaime) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Tue 02/27 2:53 PM
Order Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Fallbrook Technologies Inc., Fallbrook Technologies International Co., Hodyon, Inc., and Hodyon Finance, Inc. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Fallbrook Technologies Inc., Case No. 18-10384 (MFW), should be consulted for all matters concerning this case. Order Signed on 2/27/2018. (LMC) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/26 9:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-10387 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8769573, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 02/26 8:45 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Hodyon Finance, Inc.. (Enos, Kenneth) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 02/26 9:00 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (BA) |