New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:18-cv-01726
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2018
Terminated:Jul 27, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Aug 25, 2018 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
CNN America, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Naeve
Jones Day
contact info
Wendy C. Butler
Jones Day (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Phillip Sullivan Jr.
Represented By
Anne Melissa Seelig
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
19 19 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/28 11:23 AM
STIPULATION DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Phillip Sullivan, Jr. and Defendant CNN America, Inc., by and through their attorneys of record, hereby stipulate that the action captioned above shall be dismissed with prejudice as against all parties. Plaintiff Phillip Sullivan Jr. waives any and all rights to appeal. The parties shall bear their respective attorneys' fees and costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/28/2018) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
18 18 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 08/24 1:36 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) CNN America, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan Jr.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Fri 08/24 3:29 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 18 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a closed case. (dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
17 17 2 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Fri 07/27 3:05 PM
ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: The Court having been advised by the parties that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, Dkt. 16, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Clerk is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/26/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
16 16 motion Stay Thu 07/26 1:51 PM
LETTER MOTION to Stay Proceedings addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from C.K. Lee, Esq. dated July 26, 2018. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan Jr..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/29 12:29 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. Upon counsel's representation that plaintiff consents and that this extension is necessary to facilitate a possible settlement, the Court hereby extends defendant's deadline by which to respond to the complaint. The parties should not expect further extensions of this deadline. SO ORDERED. (CNN America, Inc. answer due 8/1/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/28/2018) (anc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 06/28 2:37 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Wendy Butler dated June 28, 2018. Document filed by CNN America, Inc..(Butler, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 10, 2018
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/10 11:28 AM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. Consistent with the waiver of service filed May 2, 2018, Dkt. 9, and upon counsel's representation that plaintiff consents, the deadline for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby set as July 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/10/2018) (anc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/09 12:40 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Wendy C. Butler dated May 9, 2018. Document filed by CNN America, Inc..(Butler, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/04 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy C. Butler on behalf of CNN America, Inc.. (Butler, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/03 6:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy C. Butler on behalf of Phillip Sullivan Jr.. (Butler, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/02 9:55 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. CNN America, Inc. waiver sent on 5/1/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan Jr.. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/25 2:40 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. CNN America, Inc. served on 4/20/2018, answer due 5/11/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky (Secretary of State). Document filed by Phillip Sullivan Jr.. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/16 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Phillip Sullivan Jr.. (Seelig, Anne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/27 3:36 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting5 Motion for Robert A. Naeve to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/27/2018) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 03/26 7:02 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 5 MOTION for Robert A. Naeve to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 23, 2018
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/23 7:02 PM
MOTION for Robert A. Naeve to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CNN America, Inc..(Naeve, Robert)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment Fri 03/23 7:05 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for5 MOTION for Robert A. Naeve to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14851651.(Naeve, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/27 4:57 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CNN America, Inc. (pne)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 02/27 10:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney C.K. Lee. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:12132. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331ot. (pne)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/27 10:28 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 02/27 10:29 AM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 02/27 10:29 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/26 12:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CNN America, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan Jr.. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/26 12:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/26 12:06 PM
COMPLAINT against CNN America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14742024)Document filed by Phillip Sullivan Jr..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]