UPF INNOVATIONS LLC V. THE ATHENA GROUP INC
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00037 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 25, 2018 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
THE ATHENA GROUP INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
UPF INNOVATIONS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 11/15 10:34 AM
ORDER CLOSING FILE signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/15/18. This Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the Settlement Agreement. The clerk must close the file. (tss) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/14 1:32 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/05 2:05 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings CRD to prepare PTO by 6/19/2019 . (tss) |
||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 11/02 2:51 PM
ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING 29 STATUS REPORT filed by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/2/18. The parties shall file their joint motion to dismiss on or before 11/14/2018) .) (tss) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 11/02 7:57 AM
NOTICE of Filing Joint Status Report by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Bifurcate
Thu 10/04 11:23 AM
ORDER DENYING 22 MOTION TO BIFURCATE DISCOVERY AND TRIAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/4/2018. (atm) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 10/02 12:07 PM
ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT AND STAYING DEADLINES FOR A PERIOD OF 30 DAYS signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/2/18. This Court, without hearing, grants the 26 motion in part and stays all deadlines in this case for a period of 30 days. In the event the stipulated motion to dismiss is not filed by 11/2/2018, the parties shall file a status report with this Court on 11/3/2018 . (tss) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Stay
Tue 10/02 8:14 AM
Consent MOTION to Stay by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/28 8:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED 24 MOTION FOR EXTENSION (Plaintiff's response due on or before: 10/12/2018) . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/28/2018. (kdm) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/27 8:05 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery and Trial by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
22
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Fri 09/14 10:13 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/14/2018. (atm) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Bifurcate
Thu 09/13 2:40 PM
MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery and Trial by THE ATHENA GROUP INC. (GILCHRIST, BRIAN) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Protective Order
Thu 09/13 2:21 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Rule 26 Disclosures
Wed 09/05 3:49 PM
RULE 26 Disclosures by THE ATHENA GROUP INC. (GILCHRIST, BRIAN) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Rule 26 Disclosures
Wed 09/05 2:07 PM
RULE 26 Disclosures by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/31 2:43 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
utility
Case Referred to Mediation
Wed 08/08 9:31 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (bkp) |
|
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/07 7:38 AM
SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: 14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/6/18. Discovery due by 7/19/2019 . Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/9/2019 . Jury Trial set for 1/28/2020 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Mediation to take place by 8/16/2019 . Mediation Report due by 8/30/2019 . (bkp) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 08/02 8:42 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (kdm) |
||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 08/02 11:13 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:15 Status Report,14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (bkp) |
||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Tue 07/31 4:54 PM
STATUS REPORT by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Tue 07/31 4:50 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 07/16 4:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by THE ATHENA GROUP INC. (GILCHRIST, BRIAN) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 07/16 1:18 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 07/13 1:52 PM
ANSWER to2 Amended Complaint by THE ATHENA GROUP INC. (GILCHRIST, BRIAN) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/02 10:59 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/2/18. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/16/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/15/2018 . Discovery due by 11/1/2018 . Status Report due by 8/1/2018 . (bkp) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 06/29 4:51 PM
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS 7 MOTION TO DISMISS signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/29/18. (tss) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
21
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/18 1:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by UPF INNOVATIONS LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/07 8:12 AM
Set Deadlines as to7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/21/2018) . (bkp) |
||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 05/04 3:30 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by THE ATHENA GROUP INC. (GILCHRIST, BRIAN) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 04/05 12:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING 5 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/5/18. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before 5/4/2018 . (tss) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 04/05 11:12 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by THE ATHENA GROUP INC. (GILCHRIST, BRIAN) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
AO 121 Copyright Case Notification
Tue 02/27 2:58 PM
AO 121 Copyright New Case Notification. Copy sent to the Register of Patent and Trademark Office (bkp) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/27 2:43 PM
Summons Issued as to THE ATHENA GROUP INC. (bkp) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 02/27 9:04 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Athena Group. Inc., filed by UPF Innovations, LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - '188 Patent | ||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/26 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT against UPF Innovations, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4107243.), filed by UPF Innovations, LLC. (SIPPLE, MARTIN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |