Martin v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Referred: | James L Cott |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01747 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 25, 2018 5:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
100 Bayer Boulevard
Whippany, NJ 07981 |
|
Defendant
Bayer OY
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Martin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 06/28 8:12 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (21 in 1:18-cv-00652-PAE-JLC, 19 in 1:18-cv-01867-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-02294-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-02251-PAE-JLC, 22 in 1:18-cv-00359-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-02263-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-01067-PAE-JLC, 17 in 1:18-cv-00558-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-01652-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00535-PAE-JLC, 19 in 1:18-cv-01896-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-01960-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-01848-PAE-JLC, 20 in 1:18-cv-01810-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-01370-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-01365-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-01987-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-01839-PAE-JLC, 20 in 1:18-cv-01369-PAE-JLC, 22 in 1:18-cv-01379-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00866-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00830-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-00544-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00614-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-02262-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-01095-PAE-JLC, 13 in 1:18-cv-00536-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00815-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00904-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-01750-PAE-JLC, 20 in 1:18-cv-01851-PAE-JLC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01778-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-01747-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00812-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00853-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-01832-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00851-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-00555-PAE-JLC, 17 in 1:18-cv-01898-PAE-JLC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00616-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-00545-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-01849-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-02001-PAE-JLC) Memorandum & Opinion, in favor of Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer OY, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Pharma AG against Alfreda Bolden, Amanda Sailors, Andrea Novak, Angela Norred, Anisha Longmire, Arin Boehmer, Ashley McCune, Callie Jordan, Candice Arnwine, Chanell Winn, Charles Monet, Christina Ray, Cynthia Munro, David Stringfellow, Devon Parker, Elizabeth Olson, Emily Springer, Erica Rodriguez, Jerry Jane Wynne, Jill Sneed, Kaitlin Stringfellow, Kamille Turnbow, Kay Page, Kayla Clayton, Keona Burton, LaVonda Lewis, Latasha Monet, Latoya Hunt, Latoya Stevenson, Lequita Neely, Lindsey Cadwell, Lycia Sledge, Mary Jo Tracey, Maurissa Harris, Melissa Martin, Michelle Thomas, Michelle Vaeth, Naomi Wilson, Nija Johnson, Olushola Walker, Reva McDonald, Rickeya Freeman, Sarah Jenkins, Tashena Eason, Whitney Roberts. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated June 11, 2019, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted and all remaining member cases in this MDL are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/21/2019) (tp) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Right to Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 Right to Appeal - NOA | ||
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
55
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 06/11 1:16 PM
OPINION & ORDER re: (328 in 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the reasons stated above, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion (No. 17 MD 2767, Dkt. 328), and to enter judgment in and close all remaining member cases in this MDL. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/11/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
15 | 15
55
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 06/11 8:55 AM
OPINION & ORDER re: (328 in 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the reasons stated above, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion (No. 17 MD 2767, Dkt. 328), and to enter judgment in and close all remaining member cases in this MDL. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/11/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 03/15 2:57 PM
ORDER granting (343) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC; granting (134) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02674-PAE-JLC; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02694-PAE-JLC; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02705-PAE-JLC; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02715-PAE-JLC; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02718-PAE-JLC; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02737-PAE-JLC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02745-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02812-PAE-JLC; granting (73) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02813-PAE-JLC; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02814-PAE-JLC; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02816-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02819-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02821-PAE-JLC; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02826-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02827-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02861-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02865-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02866-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02891-PAE-JLC; granting (131) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02900-PAE-JLC; granting (113) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02916-PAE-JLC; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02943-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02945-PAE-JLC; granting (137) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02947-PAE-JLC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02950-PAE-JLC; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02952-PAE-JLC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02961-PAE-JLC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02962-PAE-JLC; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02992-PAE-JLC; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02993-PAE-JLC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02994-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03067-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03068-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03069-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03072-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03074-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03080-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03083-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03084-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03085-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03087-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03088-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03124-PAE-JLC; granting (192) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03125-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03143-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03146-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03147-PAE-JLC; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03216-PAE-JLC; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03219-PAE-JLC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03231-PAE-JLC; granting (155) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03233-PAE-JLC; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03236-PAE-JLC; granting (99) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03238-PAE-JLC; granting (83) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03240-PAE-JLC; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03242-PAE-JLC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03298-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03334-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03335-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03354-PAE-JLC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03390-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03497-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03499-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04301-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04579-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04581-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04582-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04583-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04584-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04597-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04967-PAE-JLC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04981-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05090-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05138-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05335-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05338-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05345-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05762-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05763-PAE-JLC; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-06638-PAE-JLC; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-06714-PAE-JLC; granting (31) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07149-PAE-JLC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07447-PAE-JLC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07449-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07877-PAE-JLC; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08399-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08479-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08487-PAE-JLC; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08714-PAE-JLC; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-09698-PAE-JLC; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-10241-PAE-JLC; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-00349-PAE-JLC; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-02782-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-02885-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03784-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03796-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03847-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03860-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04067-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04627-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04655-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04713-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04721-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04766-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04792-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04794-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04842-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04976-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-05698-PAE-JLC; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-06415-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-06732-PAE-JLC; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-07330-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-07774-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08658-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08888-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08893-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08895-PAE-JLC; granting (17) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08899-PAE-JLC; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08902-PAE-JLC; granting (12) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-09607-PAE-JLC; granting (11) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-12373-PAE-JLC. It is hereby ORDERED that Ms. Natale's Motion is GRANTED and she is hereby terminated from these actions. The Clerk is notified to terminate Ms. Natale from all further notices in these actions. So entered this 15th day of March 2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/15/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al. (anc) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 10/25 10:05 AM
ORDER: The Court directs counsel promptly to meet and confer as to next steps in this multi-district litigation. The Court asks counsel to consider whether, as in the earlier multi-district litigation involving Mirena presided over by Judge Seibel, this case should now proceed to motions for summary judgment limited to the issue of general causation. A joint letter, setting forth the parties' proposal(s) as to next steps, is due Friday, November 9, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/24/2018)***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
12 | 12
156
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 10/24 10:54 AM
OPINION & ORDER re: (134, 136, 138, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, 155,158, 160, 162, 165, 168, 170, 172, and 175 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTIONS to exclude testimony filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Bayer's motion to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' seven general-causation witnesses, and denies, as potentially moot, plaintiffs' motions to exclude Bayer's 12 general-causation witnesses. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkts. 134, 136, 138, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, 155, 158, 160, 162, 165, 168, 170, 172, and 175. An order as to next steps in this case will follow shortly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/24/2018) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) Modified on 10/24/2018 (anc) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/06 12:47 PM
MOTION for Robert J. Binstock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brianna Smith.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(Binstock, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Supreme Court of Texas- Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 4 Texas State Bar- Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/02 12:02 PM
ORDER: On April 9, 2018, the Court will hold "Science Day" to provide the Court with an overview of the medical, scientific, and epidemiological issues associated with the Mirena intrauterine device and intracranial hypertension in an objective format without advocacy. As previously reviewed with counsel, the Court intends Science Day to proceed in the following manner: as set forth herein. The Court has allotted the full day of April 9, 2018 for Science Day. Proceedings will begin at 9 a.m. and will include an hour-long break for lunch, and comfort breaks in the mid-morning and mid-afternoon. Court will adjourn by 5 p.m. For the parties' planning purposes, each side is allocated at least two hours in which to present. Plaintiffs will present first, and defendants will present second. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(ama) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/02 11:37 AM
ORDER: Argument on the parties' Daubert motions is scheduled for April 10 and 11 and, if necessary, April 12, 2018. Argument each day will begin at 9 a.m. There will be an hour-long lunch break. The Court expects to adjourn each day at 5 p.m. On March 23, 2018, the parties proposed a sequence as to the topics to be covered at argument. See Dkt. 151. The Court hereby approves that proposed sequence. The Court does not, however, adopt the rigid allocation of 30 minutes time for argument as to each expert, as individual experts may merit more or less time. For avoidance of doubt, the Court is persuaded that argument is merited on both sides' Daubert motions-those directed at plaintiffs' experts and those directed at Bayer's experts. While the Court is hopeful that argument will be completed by the end of the day on April 11, 2018, the parties are to continue to reserve April 12, 2018 in the event that additional time is needed. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 4/10/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(ama) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/05 4:32 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer OY, Bayer Pharma AG. (jgo) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/02 7:59 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Per chambers instructions) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 06/23/2017) (sjo) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Wed 02/28 1:30 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-md-2767. Document filed by Melissa Martin.(Miller, Peter) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 02/28 1:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Miller, Peter) |
|
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Wed 02/28 4:56 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Wed 02/28 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 02/28 4:57 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jc) |
||
utility
Case Consolidation - MDL
Fri 03/02 7:57 AM
CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. (sjo) |
||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 02/27 2:32 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Peter Andrew Miller to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Incorrect Origin Code selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Related Case Statement
Tue 02/27 2:33 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Peter Andrew Miller to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the earlier filed case caption is not included;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 02/27 2:35 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 02/27 2:36 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Tue 02/27 2:36 PM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 17-md-2767. (jgo) |
||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Mon 02/26 5:46 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-MD-2767. Document filed by Melissa Martin.(Miller, Peter) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 02/26 5:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Miller, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 02/26 5:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Bayer Pharma AG; Bayer Oy, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Melissa Martin. (Miller, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/26 5:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer OY, Bayer Pharma AG. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14744962)Document filed by Melissa Martin.(Miller, Peter) |