Colorado District Court
Judge:Raymond P Moore
Referred: Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:18-cv-00497
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000(e)(2) - (s)(h) -- Job Discrimination (Sexual Harassment)
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2018
Terminated:Jan 10, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Aug 26, 2018 3:31 AM MDT
Defendant
Murphy Company Mechanical Contractors and Engineers
Represented By
Brendan Daniel Benson
Miletich PC
contact info
Amy L. Miletich
Miletich PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hannah Frederick
Represented By
Sean Michael McCurdy
Mccurdy & Eichstadt, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, January 10, 2019
59 59 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 01/10 9:07 AM
ORDER granting58 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. The case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear her or its own attorney's fees and costs. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/10/2019. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
58 58 motion Dismiss Wed 01/09 1:05 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendant Murphy Company Mechanical Contractors and Engineers.(Miletich, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)