Doe v. Greitens et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry Edward Autrey |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00339 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 27, 2018 3:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
James A. Direnna
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe I
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe II
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric R. Greitens
Governor of the State of Missouri 2729 Plaza Dr. P.O. Box 236
Jefferson City, MO 65102 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joshua D. Hawley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jade D. James
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sarah Martin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Katherine J. Matthews
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David A. Poggemeier
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David E. Tannenhill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Doe
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 21 2019
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No. 17], is GRANTED. 17 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/21/19. (CLA) |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Letter re:Writ of Certiorari filed w/US Supreme Court
Wed 11/25 10:26 AM
LETTER from USCA with letter/order from U.S. Supreme Court attached. USCA Appeal #: 19-1578 Supreme Court #: 20-385. The petition for writ of certiorari has been denied.(MCB) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
Letter re:Writ of Certiorari filed w/US Supreme Court
Fri 09/25 3:26 PM
LETTER from USCA with letter/order from U.S. Supreme Court attached. USCA Appeal #: 19-1578 Supreme Court #: 20-385. The petition for writ of certiorari has been filed.(MCB) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 07/22 12:32 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to29 Notice of Appeal filed by Judy Doe USCA # 19-1578 In accordance with the judgment and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. Appeal is his appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court, briefs of the parties and was argued by counsel. After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court.. (AAT) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 07/15 12:20 PM
ORDER of USCA as to29 Notice of Appeal filed by Judy Doe Regarding: The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. The petition for rehearing by the panel is also denied. USCA Appeal #: 19-1578 (AAT) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
USCA Judgment
Tue 06/09 10:54 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to29 Notice of Appeal filed by Judy Doe Before BENTON, GRASZ and STRAS, Circuit Judges. This appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court, briefs of the parties and was argued by counsel. After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court. (MCB) |
|
36 | 36
8
pgs
appeal
Opinion from USCA
Tue 06/09 10:51 AM
OPINION from USCA re29 Notice of Appeal : We accordingly affirm the judgment of the district court. USCA Appeal #: 19-1578 (MCB) |
|
Att: 1 cover letter from the Court of Appeals, | ||
Att: 2 Letter to publishing | ||
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 03/25 2:18 PM
ORDER of USCA as to29 Notice of Appeal filed by Judy Doe Regarding: Mr. Peter T. Reed's motion to withdraw as retained counsel is granted. USCA Appeal #: 19-1578 (MCB) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
Letter from USCA
Tue 03/26 4:07 PM
LETTER from USCA re29 Notice of Appeal : USCA Appeal #: 19-1578 KJS) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
Briefing Schedule from USCA
Wed 03/20 12:00 PM
Briefing Schedule from USCA for29 Notice of Appeal filed by Judy Doe USCA Appeal Number: 19-1578 (See attached document for all other deadlines.)(KJS) |
|
32 | 32
appeal
Initial Notification from USCA
Wed 03/20 11:59 AM
Initial Notification from USCA for29 Notice of Appeal filed by Judy Doe USCA Appeal Number: 19-1578 KJS) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 03/18 3:43 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - In accordance with the Opinion, Memorandum and Order entered on the 21st day of February, 2019, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this action is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/18/19. (KJS) |
|
30 | 30
appeal
Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement
Mon 03/18 10:35 AM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding28 Memorandum & Order. Notice of Appeal filed on 3/17/19 by Plaintiff Judy Doe. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(BAK) |
|
Sunday, March 17, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Sun 03/17 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to28 Memorandum & Order by Plaintiff Judy Doe. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0865-7095369. |
|
Att: 1 Form A | ||
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
18
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Thu 02/21 1:11 PM
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No. 17], is GRANTED.17 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/21/19. (CLA) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
order
A Docket Text Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Mon 01/07 11:33 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Joshua Divine by Defendants James A. Direnna, John Doe I, John Doe II, Eric R. Greitens, Joshua D. Hawley, Jade D. James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J. Matthews, David A. Poggemeier, David E. Tannenhill. (Divine, Joshua) filed by John Doe I, James A. Direnna, Katherine J. Matthews, John Doe II, Sarah Martin, David A. Poggemeier, Eric R. Greitens, Jade D. James, David E. Tannenhill, Joshua D. Hawley ; GRANTED (Attorney Joshua M. Divine terminated.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/7/19. (KJS) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Withdraw as Attorney/Firm
Fri 01/04 5:23 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Joshua Divine by Defendants James A. Direnna, John Doe I, John Doe II, Eric R. Greitens, Joshua D. Hawley, Jade D. James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J. Matthews, David A. Poggemeier, David E. Tannenhill. (Divine, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Surresponse to Motion (Need Leave of Court)
Wed 06/13 4:15 PM
SURRESPONSE to Motion re17 First MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
24 | 24
order
A Docket Text Order
Wed 06/13 3:05 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:22 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Response by Plaintiff Judy Doe.(Mac Naughton, William) filed by Judy Doe ; LEAVE TO FILE SUR-RESPONSE IS GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 06/13/2018. (AAS) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/12 2:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re22 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Response filed by Defendant Joshua D. Hawley. (Sauer, Dean) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Leave to
Tue 06/12 11:16 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Response by Plaintiff Judy Doe.(Mac Naughton, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Sur Response | ||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 06/05 4:59 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re17 First MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Joshua D. Hawley. (Sauer, Dean) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/29 12:31 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re17 First MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Fri 05/04 4:07 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 First MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) filed by Judy Doe ;GRANTED( Response to Court due by 6/8/2018.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 05/04/2018. (AAS) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 05/03 12:09 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 First MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/30 4:37 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Joshua D. Hawley. (Sauer, Dean) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Entry of Appearance
Tue 03/06 9:57 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua M. Divine for Defendants James A. Direnna, John Doe I, John Doe II, Eric R. Greitens, Joshua D. Hawley, Jade D. James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J. Matthews, David A. Poggemeier, David E. Tannenhill. (Divine, Joshua) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Entry of Appearance
Tue 03/06 9:55 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Dean John Sauer for Defendants James A. Direnna, John Doe I, John Doe II, Eric R. Greitens, Joshua D. Hawley, Jade D. James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J. Matthews, David A. Poggemeier, David E. Tannenhill. (Sauer, Dean) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
CJRA Order
Fri 03/02 1:27 PM
CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (CAR) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Thu 03/01 6:36 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:59 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL JOHN DOE II WAIVER OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:58 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL JOHN DOE I WAIVER OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:57 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL TANNENHILL WAIVER OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:56 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL MATTHEWS WAIVER OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:56 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL MARTIN WAIVER OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:55 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL JAMES WAIVER OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:54 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL POGGEMEIER WAIVER OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:53 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL HAWLEY WAIVER OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:52 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL GREITENS WAIVER OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:36 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Thu 03/01 4:35 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Judy Doe. (Mac Naughton, William) |
|
misc
Case Opening Notification
Thu 03/01 12:41 PM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (JWD) |
||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/28 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6405369, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Jduy Doe.(Mac Naughton, William) |