Unified Government of Athens-Clarke County Georgia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45218 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Middle, 3:18-cv-00015 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:16 PM EST |
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Novartis AG
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Harco, Inc. fka Harco Drug, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
J M Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership I
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership II
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan N.V.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Unified Government of Athens-Clarke County Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:25 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2802857, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs(GARRARD, HENRY) [Transferred from gamd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
Notice of Deficiency ; Attorney Case Opening - Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization - The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES) - Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties - For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia - NO NEED TO REFILE, docket has been corrected by case manager. (ggs) [Transferred from gamd on 2/28/2018.] | ||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11) transferring proceedings to the Northern District of Ohio (tlf). [Transferred from gamd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Middle. Case number 3:18-cv-00015. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |