Lawrence County, Alabama v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45228 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 5:18-cv-00243 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:17 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence County, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/08/2019 2:32 PM EDT |
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 172 pgs COMPLAINT with jury demand against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Lawrence County, Alabama.(SPT ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (SPT ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804; record electronically transferred to the Clerk of Court in the Northern District of Ohio. (SPT)(Entered 2/27/18) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 5:18-cv-00243. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |