Marshall County, Alabama et al v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45230 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 4:18-cv-00226 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:17 PM EST |
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janseen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. F/K/A PAR PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant/Intervenor
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Grant, Alabama, Town Of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas, Alabama, The City of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guntersville, Alabama, The City of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Boaz, Alabama, City of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arab, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albertville, Alabama, City of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marshall County, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/08/2019 2:32 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 56 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L P, Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., filed by Douglas, Alabama, The City of, Guntersville, Alabama, The City of, Marshall County, Alabama, Boaz, Alabama, City of, Grant, Alabama, Town Of, Arab, Alabama, Albertville, Alabama, City of.(JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3024212, NDAL receipt #B4601086661. (Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/9/2018 (JLC). [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Albertville, Alabama, City of, Arab, Alabama, Boaz, Alabama, City of, Douglas, Alabama, The City of, Grant, Alabama, Town Of, Guntersville, Alabama, The City of, Marshall County, Alabama. (Friedman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 2/12/2018. (KWC) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
4 | 4 ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L P, Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 13th day of February, 2018.(JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas, Alabama, The City of, Marshall County, Alabama, Boaz, Alabama, City of, Arab, Alabama, Albertville, Alabama, City of. Actavis Pharma Inc served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall County, Alabama et al., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Cephalon, Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Insys Therapeutics Inc served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; McKesson Corporation served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Purdue Pharma Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018; Purdue Pharma L P served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by H Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, H) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by J Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL; docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in Northern District of Ohio. (SAC ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 4:18-cv-00226. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |