Summers County Commission v. Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45226 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 21:0801 |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2018 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 5:17-cv-04579 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:18 PM EST |
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership I
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richie Pharmacal
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Top Rx, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Summers County Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2019 10:49 AM EDT |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/28/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 37 pgs COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6149890. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 21A, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 24 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Summers County Commission for Kroger Limited Partnership I, McKesson Corporation, Richie Pharmacal, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., and Top Rx, LLC, re:1 Complaint. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/28/2018.] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kroger Limited Partnership I, McKesson Corporation, Richie Pharmacal, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., and Top Rx, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/28/2018.] | |
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-11), MDL 2804. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 2/26/2016. (cc: attys) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/28/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 5:17-cv-04579. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |