Colorado District Court
Judge:William J Martinez
Case #: 1:18-cv-00517
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2018
Terminated:Apr 09, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 29, 2018 3:19 AM MDT
Defendant
Pamela Paine
Represented By
David H. McConaughy
Garfield & Hecht, Pc-Glenwood Springs
contact info
Defendant
Robert Paine
Represented By
David H. McConaughy
Garfield & Hecht, Pc-Glenwood Springs
contact info
Defendant
Vail Valley Pest Control LLC
Represented By
David H. McConaughy
Garfield & Hecht, Pc-Glenwood Springs
contact info
Plaintiff
Orkin, LLC
Represented By
Timothy Michael Kratz
Jackson Lewis, P.C.-Denver
contact info
Melisa Hallie Panagakos
Jackson Lewis, P.C.-Denver
contact info


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Monday, April 09, 2018
23 23 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Wed 04/11 1:12 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 4/9/2018. Text Only Entry (angar, )
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Mon 04/09 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Orkin, LLC (Panagakos, Melisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 03/29 4:28 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendants Pamela Paine and Vail Valley Pest Control LLC shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 4/30/2018. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/29/2018. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
Related: [-]
20 20 order Memorandum Thu 03/29 3:57 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint,, filed by Vail Valley Pest Control LLC, Robert Paine, Pamela Paine. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/29/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 03/29 1:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint,, by Defendants Pamela Paine, Robert Paine, Vail Valley Pest Control LLC. (McConaughy, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/28 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Death of Robert Paine by Defendants Pamela Paine, Vail Valley Pest Control LLC (McConaughy, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 16, 2018
17 17 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Fri 03/16 3:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orkin, LLC. Pamela Paine served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018; Robert Paine served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018; Vail Valley Pest Control LLC served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018.(Kratz, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit C
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/16 2:58 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McConaughy, David)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 03/16 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David H. McConaughy on behalf of All Defendants Attorney David H. McConaughy added to party Pamela Paine(pty:dft), Attorney David H. McConaughy added to party Robert Paine(pty:dft), Attorney David H. McConaughy added to party Vail Valley Pest Control LLC(pty:dft) (McConaughy, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
14 14 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/05 4:37 PM
ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 5/3/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/5/2018. (jgonz, )
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order Mon 03/05 12:29 PM
ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2017 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/ 5/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/05 12:28 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/5/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion for TRO Mon 03/05 12:14 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order6 . To obtain a TRO, Plaintiff must satisfy the same elements it would need to satisfy for a preliminary injunction. See NRC Broad. Inc. v. Cool Radio, LLC , 2009 WL 2965279, at *1 (D. Colo. Sept. 14, 2009). Among those elements, "a showing of probable irreparable harm is the single most important prerequisite." Dominion Video Satellite, Inc. v. Echostar Satellite Corp. , 356 F.3d 1256, 1260 (10th Cir. 2004) (internal quotation marks omitted). Plaintiff's argument regarding irreparable harm is literally one paragraph long and is essentially boilerplate. It fails to show irreparable harm on its face. Moreover, Plaintiff has not followed the requirements for a TRO set forth in D.C.COLO.LCivR 65.1(a). For these reasons, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/05/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Reassigning Case Mon 03/05 10:11 AM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to9 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-00517-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Mon 03/05 10:07 AM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Reassigning Case Mon 03/05 8:28 AM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 7 Minute Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-00517-WYD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
7 7 order Minute Order Fri 03/02 5:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER. This matter is before the Court upon the filing of6 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(2)(a), civil actions in which a motion for injunctive relief has been filed shall be assigned to a District Judge. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this matter to a District Judge. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/02/2018. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
Related: [-]
6 6 15 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 03/02 4:48 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Plaintiff Orkin, LLC.(Panagakos, Melisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Order (PDF Only)
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/02 4:26 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Rollins, Inc for Orkin, LLC. (Panagakos, Melisa)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 03/02 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melisa Hallie Panagakos on behalf of Orkin, LLCAttorney Melisa Hallie Panagakos added to party Orkin, LLC(pty:pla) (Panagakos, Melisa)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Issued Fri 03/02 1:23 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rroge, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 03/02 1:17 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/02 12:43 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Pamela Paine, Robert Paine, Vail Valley Pest Control LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5974962)Attorney Timothy Michael Kratz added to party Orkin, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Orkin, LLC.(Kratz, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement (Pamela Paine),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Employment Agreement (Robert Paine),
Att: 3 5 pgs Exhibit 3 - 1 26-2018 Letter from Vongrabow to Robert and Pamela Paine,
Att: 4 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summons Pamela Paine,
Att: 6 Summons Robert Paine,
Att: 7 Summons Vail Valley Pest Control